Phillips v. Blanks et al
Plaintiff: |
Clint Phillips, III |
Defendant: |
Unknown Blanks, City of St. Louis and Barnes Jewish Hospital |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00485 |
Filed: |
March 18, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles A. Shaw |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit a second amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth in this Memorandum and Order, by July 20, 2015 Plaintiff is advised that his failure to comp ly fully and timely with this Order will result of the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to him.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail to plaintiff a blank form complaint for the fili ng of a prisoner civil rights complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall modify the docket sheet to change the name of defendant Unknown Blanks to defendant Michael A. Blanks, based on information provided by plaintiff in Document 12. Response to Court due by 7/20/2015.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/18/2015. (MRC)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before June 18, 2015, plaintiff shall provide the Court with the full name and address of defendant Officer Unknown Blanks, so that service may be effected. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply fully and timely with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action, without prejudice and without further notice to plaintiff. Response to Court due by 6/18/2015. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/18/15. (CSG)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [Doc. 2] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to be issued as to defendant Unknow n Blanks in his individual capacity only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Unknown Blanks, in his individual capacity, shall reply to the complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's official-capacity claims against Unknown Blanks and all claims against the City of St. Louis and Barnes Jewish Hospital are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to this Court's differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B(prisoner actions-standard). A separate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/8/2015. (MRC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?