Presswood v. Pernix Therapeutics Holdings et al
Plaintiff: |
Alan Presswood |
Defendant: |
Pernix Therapeutics Holdings, Somaxon Pharamceuticals, Inc. and John 1-10 Does |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00592 |
Filed: |
April 8, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette A. Baker |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. ยง 0227 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 28, 2017 |
Filing
95
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) is GRANTED. [Doc. 83.] IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement is GRANTED. [Doc. 92.] An amended Order of Dismissal remanding this action will be filed contemporaneously with this order.[Doc. 79.] 92 83 79 83 Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 9/28/17. (CLA)
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Alan Presswood, D.C. P.C.s Second Amended Complaint and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint are GRANTED. [Docs. 29 , 67 .] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs oral motion to stay this action is DENIED. A separate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/30/16. (KJS)
|
October 25, 2016 |
Filing
73
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion to Stay Case including Briefing on Defendants Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, pending Disposition of the Bankruptcy Court Objection is DENIED. [Doc. 70 . ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendants Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint no later than November 1, 2016. [Doc. 67 .] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may file a Reply Brie f in Support of their Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint no later than November 3, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear in person for oral argument regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lac k of Jurisdiction [Doc. 29 ] and Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint [Doc. 67 .] on Monday, November 7, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13- North of the Thomas F. Eagleton Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. ( Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2016 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 10/25/16. (KJS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?