St. Louis County v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: |
St. Louis County |
Defendant: |
Carl Johnson and Carol Johnson |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00745 |
Filed: |
May 11, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1455 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 28, 2015 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 16 PRO SE MOTION This Court to Order Copy of Complete State Court File filed by Defendant Carol Johnson, Defendant Carl Johnson; motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/28/15. (CSG)
|
May 19, 2015 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 13 MOTION for Relief From Order filed 5/12/15 filed by Defendant Carol Johnson, Defendant Carl Johnson; motion is ORDERED DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/19/15. (CSG)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 10 MOTION to Clarify filed by Defendant Carol Johnson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to clarify [Doc. #10] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' "supplemental filings" rela ting to the notice of removal, filed after this Court's remand of this matter, [Doc. #11 and #12] shall be returned to defendants, as they were not a part of the Court's record at the time the Court made its decision to remand this action. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/15/15. (CSG)
|
May 12, 2015 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Carol Johnson, Defendant Carl Johnson, 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Defendant Carol Johnson, Defendant Carl Johnson, 7 PRO SE MOTION Overturn Convictions or Motion to Overturn Convictions and Order New Trial filed by Defendant Carol Johnson, Defendant Carl Johnson, 8 PRO SE MOTION Injunction Against Attorney Robson, St. Louis County Counselor filed by Plaintiff St. Louis County, 5 PRO SE MOTION Extension of Time to File State Court File filed by Defendant Carol Johnson, Defendant Carl Johnson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that defendants' motion for extension of time to file a copy of the State Court file [Doc. #5] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is REMANDED to the Municipal Court of St. Louis County. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk s hall forward a certified copy of this Order to the Municipal Court of St. Louis County, with reference to St. Louis County v. Carl and Carol Johnson, Case Nos. 14188551-01 and 14188551-02. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/12/15. (certified copy sent to Municipal Court of St. Louis County)(CSG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?