Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund, Brandon Flinn, Danny Jenkins, Steve MacDonald, Charles Bean, Donald Willey, Gary Elliott, Jay Schultehenrich, David A. Gillick, Brad Grant, Michael Lutz, Corey Black, Norman Merlo, Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis, Jeffrey O'Connell, Richard McLaughlin, Rick Casson, Lou Grasse, Joseph Leritz, Doug Wachsnicht, Joe Hoette, William L. Luth, Donald C. Grant, St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan, John Eremita, AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund, Patrick R. Pryor, Perri Pryor, Richard McGuire, John B. Morgan, Phil Hocher, Robert J. Wesolich, Joe Scarfino, Cliff Land, John J. Smith, Sr. and Local Union Nos. 42-110, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Defendant: J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00960
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Shirley P. Mensah
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery [Doc. # 30 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's representative, Jimmie Brown, shall appear at a deposition scheduled on March 9, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. at the office of plaintiffs' counsel, and shall produce the documents requested in plaintiffs' notice of deposition [Doc. #30-2].The defendant and Jimmie Brown are advised that failure to comply with this Order may resul t in the imposition of monetary or other sanctions as authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and may be treated as contempt of court.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to defendant J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc., and defendant's representative Mr. Jimmie Brown at the following addresses: J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc. 5141 North Hanley Road St. Louis, MO 63134 Mr. Jimmie Brown JL Brown Contracting Service, Inc. 4624 Behlman Estates Ln. Florissant, MO 63034 (order mailed to both addresses). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/2/17. (KKS)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees [Doc. # 25 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc. shall pay to plaintiffs $464.00 for attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/21/2016. (CLO)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for civil contempt [Doc. # 18 ] is granted as to defendant J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc. for failure to comply with the October 6, 2015, order directing it to produ ce its records for inspection by plaintiffs. The motion is denied as to non-party Jimmie Brown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc. is held in contempt of the authority of this Court for its failure to comply wi th the October 6, 2015, order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc. shall pay to the Clerk of Court a fine in the amount of Two Hundred Dollars (US $200.00) per day, beginning on October 3, 2016, and contin uing thereafter until defendant satisfies the Court in writing that it is no longer in contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall promptly inform the Court in writing of defendants compliance with the order of October 6, 2015. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall have until October 3, 2016, in which to file a verified statement of attorneys fees and costs incurred bringing the motion for contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to defendant at the following address: J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc. 5141 North Hanley Road St. Louis, MO 63134 Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 9/20/16. (JAB)(Order mailed) (cc:Finance)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for a default order to compel an accounting [Doc. #6] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not later than November 6, 2015, defendant J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc., shall p roduce for inspection by plaintiffs all books, ledgers, payroll records, cash disbursement ledgers, bank statements and other documents reflecting or pertaining to all hours worked by and wages paid to employees of J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc ., for the period beginning March 1, 2014, through the present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to defendant at the following address: J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc. 5151 North Hanley Road St. Louis, MO 63134 (copy of order mailed to J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/6/2015. (KMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund et al v. J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater St. Louis Construction Laborers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Flinn
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Jenkins
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve MacDonald
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bean
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Willey
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Elliott
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Schultehenrich
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Gillick
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Grant
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lutz
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Black
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Merlo
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Construction Laborers Pension Trust of Greater St. Louis
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey O'Connell
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McLaughlin
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Casson
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Grasse
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leritz
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Wachsnicht
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hoette
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Luth
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C. Grant
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Vacation Fund - Vacation Plan
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eremita
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGC-Eastern Missouri Laborers' Joint Training Fund
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick R. Pryor
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perri Pryor
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McGuire
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Morgan
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Hocher
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Wesolich
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Scarfino
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliff Land
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Smith, Sr.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union Nos. 42-110, Laborers International Union of North America, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Billington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J L Brown Contracting Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?