Monroe v. Bernsen et al
Plaintiff: |
Jason Monroe |
Defendant: |
Herbert L. Bernsen, Lillie Hopkins, Milton Mitchell, Major Howard and Unknown Hayward |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv01049 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
David D. Noce |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 25, 2016 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel discovery (Doc. 45) is sustained in that defendants, must provide plaintiff with a paper copy of documents described in categories (1), (2), (3), and (4) within 30 days of this date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion for a protective order (Doc. 46) is denied without prejudice. THE COURT REMINDS THE PARTIES THAT, PURSUANT TO THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MUST BE FILED NOT LATER THAN JUNE 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 3/25/2016. (KMS)
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must provide the Court with the full names of the Unknown defendants and with the correct address for defendant Mitchell no later than twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/9/2015. (KMS)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to issue process on defendants Herbert Bernsen, Lillie Hopkins, Milton Mitchell, Unknown Lt. Davis, Unknown Lt. Woods, Unknown (Caseworker) Fitzgerald, and Unknown (Caseworker) Sanchez. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Major Howard, Unknown Hayward, Unknown Perry, Steve Timmons, Fay Crancer, Linda Hendrix, and Rita Hendrix are DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/29/2015. (NEB)
|
July 28, 2015 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 5 ; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration [ECF No. 5] isGRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $36.00 no later than August 17, 2015. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint no later than October16, 2015.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, this action will be summarily dismissed. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 8/17/2015., Response to Court due by 10/16/2015.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 7/28/15. (KKS)
|
July 16, 2015 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : 2 GRANTING MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Jason Monroe ; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $36.00within thirty (30) d ays of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittancepayable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) hisprison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the re mittance is for an originalproceeding.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civilrights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the Court form within thirty days fr om the date of this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further notice. (forms & order mailed to plaintiff) ( Response to Court due by 8/17/2015.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 7/16/15. (KKS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?