Watson v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: |
Pierre Watson |
Defendant: |
Unknown Moore, Unknown Hayden, Unknown Kramer, St. Louis County Justice Services, Herb Bernsen, Erica Unknown and Amy L. Janssen |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv01241 |
Filed: |
August 13, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Erica Crisss Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 81 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Erica Criss in Count IV of the Third Amended Complaint are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Erica Criss (Nurse Practitioner) terminated.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/28/17. (KJS)
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defense counsel will provide the Court with defendant Erica Criss last known address, in camera, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Response to Court due by 9/29/2016. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/8/16. (CLA)
|
August 25, 2016 |
Filing
42
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Haydens Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 27) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Haydens Motion to Strike (ECF No. 38) is GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 36) is STRICKEN. 38 (DOC. #37) 27 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/25/16. (CLA)
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process on defendants Unknown Hayden (Field Training Officer), Unknown Moore (Correctional Officer) and Nurse Erica Unknown (Nurse Practitioner), in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Nurse Erica Unknown (Nurse Practitioner) shall be served in accordance with the Memorandum of Understanding set forth between the U.S.D.C. of the E.D.Mo. and Corizon Health, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that St. Louis County Justice Center employees Unknown Hayden and Unknown Moore shall be individually served at their place of employment, at the St. Louis County Justice Center. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 02/22/2016. (CLK)
|
January 22, 2016 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to amend his complaint by interlineation is [Doc. # 9 -1] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs amendment by interlineation shall be due to this Court no later than March 7, 2016. The amendment by interlineation shall be filed in compliance with the instructions set forth in the Courts Memorandum and Order issued on December 22, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 9 -2] is DENIED without prejudice at this time. ( Response to Court due by 3/7/2016.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 01/22/2016. (KCB)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance i s for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amendment to the complaint, by interlineation, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, detailing the capacity under which he is suing defendants Erica Unknown, Unknown Hayden and Unknown Moore. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's failure to file an amendment by interlineation within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order will result in a dismissal of this action, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Unknown Kramer, St. Louis County Justic e Services, Herb Bernsen and Amy Janssen because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on December 22, 2015. (BRP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?