Petrovic v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jovica Petrovic
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2015cv01493
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is dismissed.A separate Order of Dismissal in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/16/2019. (AAS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondents Amended Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 60 ] is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is denied as to property previously sent to Petitioner or destroyed and as to copies of files retained by Respondent which relate to Petitioners criminal case. The Motion is denied with respect to copies of files from Petitioners electronic devices which are not related to Petitioners criminal case or which are not illegal. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that Respondent shall send copies of Petitioners files as detailed above to Petitioner at his address on record within 21 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order and shall file a Report with the Court within 3 days after h aving done so advising the Court of the time, address, and manner of the said delivery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Petitioners Amended Pro Se Motion, [Doc. No. 60 ] is denied, as there was no pending FTCA action pending at the time of filing the Amended Motion.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent shall file a responsive pleading to Petitioners Complaints Under the Federal Tort Claims Act (FTCA) within 21 days from the date of this Order.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/19/19. (KJS)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioners motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [Doc. #34] is GRANTED. 34 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/8/17. (CLA)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION MEMORANDUM - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Return of Seized Property, [Doc. No. 1 ], is denied. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/30/17. (KJS)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Convert, [Doc. No. 8], is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response to the Courts show cause Order of September 15, 2015 within 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order. 8 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/3/16. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrovic v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jovica Petrovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Dianna R. Collins(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?