Hill v. State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: |
Craig Hill |
Defendant: |
State of Missouri, Thomas Preston, Corizon, Unknown Nurse and Edward Bilinski |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv01599 |
Filed: |
October 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Francois |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 19, 2016 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration [ECF No. 17] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/19/2016. (JMC)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect that Uknown Nurse is John Napier. An Order of Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/27/2016. (JMC)
|
January 6, 2016 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must show cause, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. Show Cause Response due by 1/20/2016. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/6/2016. (JMC)
|
November 18, 2015 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 no later than December 16, 2015. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t plaintiffs motion for extension of time is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint no later than January 5, 2016. In all other respects, the motion is denied. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/5/2016.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/18/2015. (JMC)
|
October 22, 2015 |
Filing
2
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copyof the motion to procee d in forma pauperis form for prisoners. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint onthe Courts form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order (Amended Pleading due by 11/23/2015). Plaintiff is advised that his amend ed complaint will take the place of his original complaint and will be the only pleading that this Court will review. So, the amended complaint must include all of plaintiffs claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $40 0 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order (Response to Court due by 11/23/2015). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also f ile a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for noncompliance with this Order, the dismissal will not count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah on 10/22/15. (CAR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?