Adams v. Judge Reno et al
Plaintiff: |
William Adams |
Defendant: |
Judge Reno and Steve Reynolds |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00003 |
Filed: |
January 4, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
David D. Noce |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 1, 2016 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time to pay the initial partial filing fee [ECF No. 6] is GRANTED. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. An Order of Dismissal will be filed separately. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 3/15/2016.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on March 1, 2016. (MCB)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER :IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECFNo. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $16.00 within thirty (30) days of the date o f this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to return the complaint to plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must sign the complaint and return it to the Court within twenty-one (21) days from the date of thi s Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff does not comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff William Adams ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 2/6/2016. response to court ddl 1/28/16) (Order and complaint mailed to plaintiff). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 1/7/16. (KKS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?