Reynolds v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: |
Kenneth Da'Von Reynolds |
Defendant: |
Harry Russell, Ronald Helms, Byington, Rachael Roessler and James Rodgers |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00149 |
Filed: |
February 4, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Francois |
Presiding Judge: |
Jean C. Hamilton |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 11, 2017 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Ronald Helmss and James Rodgerss Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 45) is DENIED. 45 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 5/11/17. (CLA)
|
August 10, 2016 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDERIT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Byington, Helms, and Rodgerss motion to dismiss [ECF No. 20] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant Byington is DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiffs medical mistreatment and failure -to-protect-claims are DISMISSED. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Roesslers motion for summary judgment [ECF No. 27] is GRANTED, and Roessler is DISMISSED from this action. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. 20 27 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/10/16. (CLA)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants Ronald Helms, Unknown Byington (Correctional Officer), and James Rodgers in accordance with the Courts agreement with the Missouri Department of Corrections. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant Rachel Roessler in accordance with the Courts agreement with Corizon, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Harry Russell is DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 4/7/16. (KJS)
|
February 23, 2016 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 7 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint no later than March 31, 2016.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motions for appointment of counsel [ECF Nos. 3 , 6 ] are DENIED without prejudice.( Response to Court due by 3/31/2016.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 02/23/2016. (CLK)
|
February 9, 2016 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $10 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Orde r. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) hisname; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint no later than twenty-one days from the date of this Order. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. 2 ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 3/9/2016.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/9/16. (CLA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?