McAllister v.St. Louis Rams, LLC

Plaintiff: Ronald McAllister
Defendant: The St. Louis Rams, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv00172
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2018 375 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Ronald McAllister's motion to amend the class certification order (#367) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/19/18. (MRS)
April 12, 2018 372 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 321 Third MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Brad Pearlman, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Richard Arnold, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff R. McNeely Cochran motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as provided herein.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/12/18. (MRS)
March 23, 2018 362 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 211 MOTION to Dismiss : Rams' Counterclaim filed by Plaintiff Ronald McAllister. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Ronald McAllister's motion to dismiss counterclaim (#211) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/23/18. (CSG)
March 21, 2018 358 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter (4:16cv189) shall be REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants motion to dismiss (#49) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/21/18. (MRS)
March 13, 2018 355 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER,,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Ronald McAllister's motion for class certification (#106, as amended #222) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff Ronald McAllister is appointed as Class Representative for the FANS Class and FANS MMPA Subclass. McAllister's attorneys, as listed on the motion, are appointed as counsel for the FANS Class and FANS MMPA Subclass. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Richard Arnolds motion for class certification (#167) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part and plaintiff Envision's motion for class certification (#170) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs Richard Arnold, R. McNeeley Cochran, and Brad Pearlman are appointed as Class Representatives fo r the Rams Class and Rams MMPA Subclass. Counsel for the Arnold and Envision plaintiffs, as listed on their motions for class certification, are appointed as counsel for the Rams Class and Rams MMPA Subclass.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/13/18. (MRS)
February 14, 2018 336 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Arnold plaintiffs second motion to compel (#311) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for protective order (#313) is GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/14/18. (MRS)
February 12, 2018 328 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter shall be REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants motion to dismiss (#49) is DENIED as moot.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/12/18. (MRS)
January 19, 2018 312 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the CVC's motion to participate in discovery (#299) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the CVC's motion to expedite ruling (#310) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/19/18. (MRS)
November 17, 2017 276 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER,GRANTING 183 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Against The Regional Convention and Visitors Commission filed by The St. Louis Rams, LLC.. GRANTING 218 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Further Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Third Party Defendant Regional Convention and Visitors Commission. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/17/17. (MRS)
November 15, 2017 275 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 224 First MOTION to Compel Against Rams filed by Plaintiff Brad Pearlman, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Richard Arnold, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff R. McNeely Cochran motion is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/15/17. (MRS)
August 11, 2017 190 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: doc 180 ..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLCs motion for stay pending arbitration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is STAYED only as to between The St. Louis Rams, LLC and the St. Louis/Regional Convention & Visitors Commission. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/11/17. (MRS)
August 4, 2017 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 134 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Motion To Stay Trial Court Proceedings filed by Defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLC IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLCs motion for stay pending arbitra tion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is STAYED only as to between The St. Louis Rams, LLC and the St. Louis/Regional Convention & Visitors Commission.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/4/17. (MRS)
June 28, 2017 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 112 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Robert D Bohm, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Sue Bohm, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Edward E. Mock, Consolidated Filer P laintiff Envision, LLC, 111 MOTION to Amend/Correct to Add Count II to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brad Pearlman, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Richard Arnold, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff R. McNeely Cochran motions ARE GRANTED( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 7/5/2017.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/28/17. (MRS)
May 23, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 116 MOTION to Compel St. Louis Convention and Visitors Commission filed by Defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLC motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CVC shall furnish access to the identified boxes of docu ments no later than June 1, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rams shall pay for the costs of accessing the stored boxes, if any, and copying costs, if applicable. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the CVC shall bear its own attorneys fees.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/23/17. (MRS)
April 18, 2017 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 92 MOTION for Extension of: Expert Deadlines filed by Defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLC, Defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLC motion is GRANTED..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Order is MODIFI ED as follows: Expert disclosures and reports as required by Rule 26(a)(2) are due May 5, 2017, with depositions of any such experts to take place no later than May 19, 2017. Plaintiffs' rebuttal witnesses and reports as required by Rule 26(a)(2 ) are due May 26, 2017, with depositions of such witnesses to take place no later than June 5, 2017.The ADR Compliance Report Deadline shall be extended to July 1, 2017( ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 7/3/2017.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/18/16. (MRS)
December 15, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 48 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Steve Henry, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff James Pudlowski, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Gail Henry, Consolidated Filer Plaintiff Louis C. Cross III motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that limited discovery shall be permitted in the Pudlowski matter for the purpose of determining whether the local controversy exception to CAFA jurisdic tion applies. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposal for proceeding with the limited discovery no later than January 13, 2017.( Response to Court due by 1/13/2017.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/15/16. (MRS)
December 14, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 45 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLC motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Courts September 21, 2016 Order (#44) is VACATED IN PART, only with respect to the Courts granting partial judgment on the pleadings to plaintiff McAllister as to the FANS Agreement. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/14/16. (MRS)
October 5, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 34 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Renewed Motion and Memorandum in Support to Consolidate with higher case number 4:16-CV-189 RLW filed by Defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants renewed motion to consolidate (#34) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the parties shall file all further documents in this case, McAllister v. St. Louis Rams, 4:16-cv-172. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/5/16. (CSG)
September 21, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motions for judgment on the pleadings (No. 4:16-cv-262, #17; No. 4:16-cv-297, #24) are GRANTED as to the FANS Agreement but DENIED as to the Rams Agreement claims.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings (No. 4:16-cv-172, #35) is GRANTED as to the FANS Agreement but DENIED as to the Rams Agreement claims. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/21/2016. (JMC)
July 6, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 4:16-cv-189, 4:16-cv-262, 4:16-cv-297 filed by Defendant The St. Louis Rams, LLC motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART...In light of the order of remand, the Court need not address consolidation of Pudlowski at this time, so the motion is denied without prejudice as to Pudlowski. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to consolidate (#23) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in p art. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Envision, LLC, et al. v. The St. Louis Rams, LLC, No. 4:16-CV-00262-CDP, and Arnold, et al. v. The St. Louis Rams, LLC, No. 4:16-cv-00297-SNLJ, be consolidated with this matter, McAllister v. The St. Louis Rams, LLC, 4:16-cv-172.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file all further documents in this case, McAllister v. The St. Louis Rams, LLC, 4:16-cv-172.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/6/16. (MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister v.St. Louis Rams, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald McAllister
Represented By: Anthony S. Bruning
Represented By: Anthony S. Bruning, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan L. Bruning
Represented By: Richard S. Cornfeld
Represented By: Mark C. Goldenberg
Represented By: Kevin Paul Green
Represented By: Thomas P. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The St. Louis Rams, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth T. Ferrick
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Represented By: James A. Klenk
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Sestric
Represented By: Anders C. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?