Clearwater Insurance Company v. The Doe Run Resources Company
Plaintiff: Clearwater Insurance Company
Defendant: The Doe Run Resources Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00195
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDRED that Third-Party Defendants Continental Casualty and The Continental Insurance Companys Motion to Strike Third Party Claims and Vacate Order, [Doc. No. 260 ], is denied.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 04/26/2019. (AAS)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Doe Run's Motion to Dismiss Northbrook Insurance Company's Amended Cross-Claim and AIU Insurance Company's First Amended Cross-Claim, [Doc. No. 233 ], is denied; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Doe Run's Motion to Dismiss First State's Amended Cross-Claims, [Doc. No. 241 ], is denied. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/13/2019. (CLO)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Doe Runs Motion to Stay, [Doc. No. 12], is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Doe Runs Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint, [Doc. No. 25], is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that D oe Runs Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claims and Counterclaims by Insurers Allstate Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, First State Insurance Company, and Government Employees Insurance Company for Lack of Jurisdiction and in Deference to Doe Runs Pending State Court Action, [Doc. No. 66], is denied. 12 66 25 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/3/17. (CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clearwater Insurance Company v. The Doe Run Resources Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clearwater Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan M. Dimond
Represented By: M. Adina Johnson
Represented By: R. C. Wuestling, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Doe Run Resources Company
Represented By: Marc D. Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?