MacCormack et al v. The Adel Wiggins Group et al
Plaintiff: Karen Loftus, Berj Hovsepian, Nancy Broudy and Diane MacCormack
Defendant: CSR, LTD., Paccar, Inc., Crane Co, Genuine Parts Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Aldrich Company, Kelsey Hayes Co., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., J.R. Clarkson Company, Trane US, Inc., Whitney Automotive Group Inc., General Electric Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Adel Wiggins Group, General Gasket Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., Weil-Mclain Company, Maremont Corporation, Fruehauf Corporation, PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Grinnell, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Cummins, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Caterpillar, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Dow Chemical Company, The, Buffalo Pumps, Dana Companies, LLC, CBS Corporation, Lamons Gasket Company, Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., ALFA Laval, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Peterbilt Motor Company, Ford Motor Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, Autozone, Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Kenworth Truck Company, Aurora Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, JP Bushnell Packing Supply Company, Inc., Burnham Commerical Boilers, Cleaver Brooks Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Mack Trucks Inc, Kelly Moore Paint Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., Consolidated Sugar and Refining, Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC, Continental Teves, Inc.., Taco, Inc., Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company, Conwed Corporation, Navistar, Inc., ITT Corporation, Sprinkmann Sons Corporation, FMC Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Aldrich Boiler Company, Georgia Pacific, LLC, Primerica Corporation, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., Lufkin Industries, Inc., Young Group Ltd., Western Auto Supply Company, Napa Auto Parts, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Jenkins Valves, Eaton Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc. formerly known as Akzo Nobel Paints, LLC doing business as The Glidden Company, Cutler-Hammer, American Standard Inc., ITT Industries, Inc., American Can Company, Westinghouse, Akzo Nobel Paints, LLC, Viacome, Inc., Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Jenkins Valves, Inc, Cleaver-Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., Byron Jackson Pump Division, Riley Stoker Corporation, Young Sales Corp., International Truck and Engine Corporation and J.C. Whitney & Co.
Cross Defendant: Crane Co.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00414
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 414. Tue Jan 30 15:33:00 CST 2018 (Abrams, Carrie)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 414 JUDGMENT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant Ingersoll-RandCompanys Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/30/18. (CLA)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 413. Tue Jan 30 15:29:26 CST 2018 (Abrams, Carrie)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Companys Motion for Summary Judgment based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel (ECF No. 397) is GRANTED. Aseparate Judgment will accompany this Order. #397 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/30/18. (CLA)
January 29, 2018 Filing 412 REPLY to Response to Motion re #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Barkley, Patrick)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #410 MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Hulla, Timothy) filed by Diane MacCormack ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/29/18. (CLA)
January 26, 2018 Filing 410 MOTION to Withdraw by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Hulla, Timothy)
January 23, 2018 Filing 409 RESPONSE in Opposition re #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel filed by Plaintiffs Nancy Broudy, Karen Loftus, Diane MacCormack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order (proposed Order))(Zacharopoulos, Demetrious)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to TRACK 2; Motion to Join Parties due by 3/1/2018. Discovery Completion due by 10/1/2018. ADR Future Reference 8/1/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2018. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/23/18. (KKS)
January 23, 2018 Filing 407 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton: Rule 16 Conference held on 1/23/2018. Conference held by phone. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (FTR Gold: No) (KJS)
January 22, 2018 Receipt 4644069878 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Demetrios Zacharopoulos (CCAM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #405 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Demetrios Thomas Zacharopoulos filed by Nancy Broudy, Diane MacCormack, Karen Loftus; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/22/18. (KJS)
January 22, 2018 Filing 405 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Demetrios Thomas Zacharopoulos. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644069878) by Plaintiffs Nancy Broudy, Karen Loftus, Diane MacCormack. (KJS)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Docket Text ORDER re #401 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. filed by Nancy Broudy, Diane MacCormack, Karen Loftus; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. #403 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company filed by Nancy Broudy, Diane MacCormack, Karen Loftus; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. #400 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant John Crane, Inc. filed by John Crane, Inc.; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. #402 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. filed by Nancy Broudy, Diane MacCormack, Karen Loftus; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. (Defendants ALFA Laval, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company terminated.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/22/18. (KJS)
January 22, 2018 Filing 403 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company only (Flint, Jacob)
January 22, 2018 Filing 402 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc., only (Flint, Jacob)
January 22, 2018 Filing 401 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As to Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. only (Flint, Jacob)
January 19, 2018 Filing 400 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Crane, Inc. (Bronsky, Albert)
January 12, 2018 Filing 399 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Nancy Broudy. (PROPOSED). (Flint, Jacob)
January 10, 2018 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Barkley, Patrick)
January 10, 2018 Filing 397 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Barkley, Patrick)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2-Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 1/12/2018. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/23/2018 10:15 AM before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 12/11/17. (KJS)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 395. Mon Sep 11 14:26:53 CDT 2017 (Abrams, Carrie)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Buffalos Motion for Summary Judgment based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel (ECF No. 372) is GRANTED. #372 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/11/17. (CLA)
September 6, 2017 Filing 394 ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, and, CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Tayyab, Julia)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 393. Wed Aug 30 10:23:44 CDT 2017 (Abrams, Carrie)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #390 MOTION to Dismiss Party A.W. Chesterton Company by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Flint, Jacob) filed by Diane MacCormack, #391 MOTION to Dismiss Party Adel Wiggins Group by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Flint, Jacob) filed by Diane MacCormack ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/30/17. (CLA)
August 29, 2017 Filing 392 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #381 Order to Show Cause, Regarding Service of Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company and Adel Wiggins Group by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack filed by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Reply to Court's Show Cause Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Reply to Court's Show Cause Order)(Flint, Jacob)
August 29, 2017 Filing 391 MOTION to Dismiss Party Adel Wiggins Group by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Flint, Jacob)
August 29, 2017 Filing 390 MOTION to Dismiss Party A.W. Chesterton Company by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Flint, Jacob)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #388 Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Adel Wiggins Group; THE SHOW CAUSE ORDER DOC #381 IS MOOT; SO ORDERED. #387 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Adel Wiggins Group; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. #384 First MOTION to Dismiss Party A.W. Chesterton Company; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. (A.W. Chesterton Company and Adel Wiggins Group terminated.)(**PARTIES ARE REMINDED TO USE THE PROPER JUDGE INITIALS WITHIN THE CASE NUMBER: 4:16CV00414 JCH**) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/25/17. (KJS)
August 23, 2017 Filing 388 Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Cross Defendant Adel Wiggins Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Flint, Jacob)
August 23, 2017 Filing 387 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Adel Wiggins Group by Cross Defendant Adel Wiggins Group. (Flint, Jacob)
August 23, 2017 Filing 386 REPLY (to termed motion) re #384 First MOTION to Dismiss Party A.W. Chesterton Company filed by Cross Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company. (Flint, Jacob)
August 23, 2017 Filing 385 First MOTION to Dismiss Party Adel Wiggins Group by Cross Defendant Adel Wiggins Group. (Flint, Jacob) (Pleading was not signed by counsel. See doc #387 for proper entry. Motion termed.) Modified on 8/25/2017 (KJS).
August 23, 2017 Filing 384 First MOTION to Dismiss Party A.W. Chesterton Company by Cross Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company. (Flint, Jacob)
August 16, 2017 Filing 383 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel filed by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 382. Fri Aug 11 14:52:31 CDT 2017 (Abrams, Carrie)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #380 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. by Defendant Cleaver Brooks Inc.. (McGuire, Timothy) filed by Cleaver Brooks Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/11/17. (CLA)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 381. Fri Aug 11 13:29:26 CDT 2017 (Abrams, Carrie)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), that plaintiffs shall show cause in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice as to defendant(s) ADEL WIGGINS GROUP AND A.W.CHESTERTON CO., et al. for lack of timely service: Show Cause Response due by 8/25/2017. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/11/17. (CLA)
August 9, 2017 Filing 380 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. by Defendant Cleaver Brooks Inc.. (McGuire, Timothy)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 379. Tue Aug 8 14:43:56 CDT 2017 (Abrams, Carrie)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #378 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory) filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/8/17. (CLA)
August 7, 2017 Filing 378 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
August 2, 2017 Filing 377 MEMORANDUM re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel, #373 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #374 Statement of Material Facts,, by Cross Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order (proposed) Order)(Flint, Jacob)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 376. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Fri Jul 28 13:58:01 CDT 2017 (Bernsen, John)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases are transferred to the Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. All hearings previously scheduled remain set unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/28/17. (JAB)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 375. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Wed Jul 26 13:29:12 CDT 2017 (Bernsen, John)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all cross-claims against defendant Warren Pumps are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/26/17. (JAB)
July 13, 2017 Filing 374 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel filed by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 2009 Massachusetts Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - April 2012 First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Buffalo's MSJ in Massachusetts action, #4 Exhibit D - Rule 9A letter and Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt from case docket)(Flatt, Gregory)
July 13, 2017 Filing 373 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #372 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel filed by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
July 13, 2017 Filing 372 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on the Doctrine of Collateral Estoppel by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 371. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Tue Jul 11 14:41:39 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of the cross-claims of defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each defendant who has asserted a cross-claim against Warren Pumps, LLC shall have until July 25, 2017, to show cause, in writing, why that cross-claim should not be dismissed. Failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal, without prejudice, of the non- compliant defendants cross-claim against Warren Pumps, LLC. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/11/2017. (CLO)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 369, 370. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Wed Jul 5 14:32:19 CDT 2017 (Bernsen, John)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered this same date,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed as to defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/5/17. (JAB)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Warren Pumps, LLC to dismiss [Doc. #357 ] is granted. An order of dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/5/17. (JAB)
May 11, 2017 Filing 368 ENTRY of Appearance by Marcie J. Vantine for Defendant ALFA Laval, Inc.. (Vantine, Marcie)
May 10, 2017 Filing 367 REPLY to Response to Motion re #357 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Res Judicata and Collateral Estoppel filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kidd, Anita)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 366. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Apr 28 11:26:45 CDT 2017 (Stamm, Katie)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Docket Text ORDER: #365 GRANTING MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. ( Response to Court due by 5/10/2017.). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/28/17. (KKS)
April 27, 2017 Filing 365 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 364. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Thu Apr 27 14:32:05 CDT 2017 (Stamm, Katie)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal all cross-claims asserted by or against defendant CBS Corporation.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/27/17. (KKS)
April 24, 2017 Filing 363 RESPONSE to Motion re #357 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Res Judicata and Collateral Estoppel filed by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Barth, Sean)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 361, 362. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Apr 21 14:53:31 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to defendant CBS Corporation for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/21/2017. (CLO)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant CBS Corporation to reconsider [Doc. #353 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/21/2017. (CLO)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 360. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Thu Apr 13 14:24:41 CDT 2017 (Bernsen, John)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #359 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #357 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Res Judicata and Collateral Estoppel by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Barth, Sean) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/17. (JAB)
April 12, 2017 Filing 359 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #357 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Res Judicata and Collateral Estoppel by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Barth, Sean)
April 12, 2017 Filing 358 ENTRY of Appearance by Sean Patrick Barth for Plaintiffs Diane MacCormack, Nancy Broudy, and Karen Loftus. (Barth, Sean) Modified on 4/13/2017 (CLO).
April 6, 2017 Filing 357 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Res Judicata and Collateral Estoppel by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kidd, Anita)
April 5, 2017 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re #353 MOTION for Reconsideration re #277 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dauphin, Michael)
March 30, 2017 Filing 355 RESPONSE in Opposition re #353 MOTION for Reconsideration re #277 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Andrew, Diane)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 354. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Fri Mar 24 15:48:49 CDT 2017 (Bernsen, John)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all cross-claims against defendant Crane Co. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/24/17. (JAB)
March 23, 2017 Filing 353 MOTION for Reconsideration re #277 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dauphin, Michael)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 352. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Thu Mar 9 15:35:17 CST 2017 (Bernsen, John)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered on March 8, 2016, [Doc. #350 ], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of the cross-claims of defendant Crane Co., IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each defendants who has asserted a cross-claim against Crane Co. shall have until March 23, 2017 to show cause, in writing, why that cross-claim should not be dismissed. Failure to comply with this order will result in the dismissal, without prejudice, of the non-compliant defendants cross-claim against Crane Co. (JAB)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 350,351. Wed Mar 8 10:48:06 CST 2017 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered this same date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' claims against defendant Crane Co. are dismissed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/8/17. (KXS)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Crane Co. to dismiss [Doc. #332 ] is granted. An order of partial dismissal will be entered separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 3/8/17. (KXS)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 349. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Tue Feb 14 15:27:51 CST 2017 (Stamm, Katie)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER : In accordance with the joint stipulation for dismissal between plaintiffs and defendant Lamons Gasket Company [Doc. #347 ], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of this action against defendant Lamons Gasket Company, without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties shall bear their own costs. Lamons Gasket Company terminated.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/14/17. (KKS)
February 14, 2017 Filing 348 STIPULATION for Dismissal by Defendant Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maassen, Stephen)
February 13, 2017 Filing 347 STIPULATION For Dismissal Without Prejudice by Defendant Lamons Gasket Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Paul)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 346. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Mon Feb 6 13:25:03 CST 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to withdraw Jessica Schmit as counsel for defendant Crane Co. [Doc. #345 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 2/6/2017. (CLO)
February 2, 2017 Filing 345 MOTION to Withdraw , MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Crane Co by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
February 1, 2017 CROSSCLAIM against defendant A.W. Chesterton Company, ALFA Laval, Inc., Adel Wiggins Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Cleaver Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(DOCKET ENTRY MADE FOR PURPOSES OF CORRECTING THE DOCKET SHEET ONLY).(KXS)
February 1, 2017 CROSSCLAIM against defendant A.W. Chesterton Company, ALFA Laval, Inc., Adel Wiggins Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Cleaver Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Lamons Gasket Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, filed by John Crane, Inc..(DOCKET ENTRY MADE FOR PURPOSES OF CORRECTING THE DOCKET SHEET ONLY).(KXS)
February 1, 2017 CROSSCLAIM against defendant A.W. Chesterton Company, ALFA Laval, Inc., Adel Wiggins Group, CBS Corporation, Cleaver Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(DOCKET ENTRY MADE FOR PURPOSES OF CORRECTING THE DOCKET SHEET ONLY).(KXS)
February 1, 2017 CROSSCLAIM against defendant A.W. Chesterton Company, ALFA Laval, Inc., Adel Wiggins Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, filed by Cleaver Brooks Inc.. (DOCKET ENTRY MADE FOR PURPOSES OF CORRECTING THE DOCKET SHEET ONLY).(KXS)
February 1, 2017 CROSSCLAIM against defendant A.W. Chesterton Company, ALFA Laval, Inc., Adel Wiggins Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Cleaver Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (DOCKET ENTRY MADE FOR PURPOSES OF CORRECTING THE DOCKET SHEET ONLY).(KXS)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 344. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Tue Jan 31 12:17:26 CST 2017 (Bernsen, John)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all crossclaims filed in this action are moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant BW/IP to dismiss all crossclaims [Doc. #340 ] is moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the termination of this action against all defendants not named in the first amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/31/17. (JAB)
January 27, 2017 Filing 343 ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against defendant All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Barkley, Patrick)
January 27, 2017 Filing 342 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick M. Barkley for Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Barkley, Patrick)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 341. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification. Tue Jan 17 11:03:10 CST 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants shall have until January 27, 2017, to file amended crossclaims, if appropriate. All crossclaims filed prior to the amended complaint will be deemed moot. Response to Court due by 1/27/2017. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/17/2017. (CLO)
January 10, 2017 Filing 340 MOTION to Dismiss :all Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Flowserve Corporation, Cross Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Benoist, Ashley)
January 5, 2017 Filing 339 ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Anticipated Cross-Claims of CBS Corporation to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by CBS Corporation.(Dauphin, Michael)
January 5, 2017 Filing 338 ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, by ALFA Laval, Inc..(Lore, Paul)
December 30, 2016 Filing 337 REPLY to Response to Motion re #332 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Collateral Estoppel filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
December 23, 2016 Filing 336 RESPONSE to Motion re #332 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Collateral Estoppel filed by Plaintiff Diane MacCormack. (Hulla, Timothy)
December 22, 2016 Filing 335 Defendant John Crane Inc ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by John Crane, Inc..(Bronsky, Albert)
December 19, 2016 Filing 334 Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps Inc.'s ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Flatt, Gregory)
December 16, 2016 Filing 333 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #332 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Collateral Estoppel filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wilson, Benjamin)
December 16, 2016 Filing 332 MOTION to Dismiss Case Based on Collateral Estoppel by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 331. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Fri Dec 16 14:51:17 CST 2016 (Bernsen, John)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER: In accordance with defendant Warren Pump LLCs notice of dismissal of its crossclaims [Doc. #329 ], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of Warren Pump LLCs crossclaims against the defendants named in the notice, without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(c). The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/16/16. (JAB)
December 15, 2016 Filing 330 ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM for Contribution against defendant All Defendants by Cleaver Brooks Inc..(McGuire, Timothy)
December 14, 2016 Filing 329 MOTION to Dismiss :Cross Claims as to Previously Dismissed Co-Defendants by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kidd, Anita)
December 9, 2016 Filing 328 ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Meyer, Julie) Modified on 12/12/2016 (CLO).
December 9, 2016 Filing 327 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Giokaris, Virginia)
December 8, 2016 Filing 326 ANSWER to #324 Amended Complaint,, First by Lamons Gasket Company.(Lee, Paul)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 325. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Tue Dec 6 12:50:08 CST 2016 (Bernsen, John)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion of plaintiffs and defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. to dismiss [Doc. #313 ] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/6/16. (JAB)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 323. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Mon Dec 5 09:08:46 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
December 2, 2016 Filing 324 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant ALFA Laval, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, Adel Wiggins Group, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Cleaver Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Warren Pumps, LLC Amendment to #8 Petition (Removal/Transfer), filed by Nancy Broudy, Karen Loftus, Diane MacCormack. Related document: #8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Berj Hovsepian.(CLO)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #321 MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Peition by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/02/16. (KKS)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 322. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Dec 2 15:24:29 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER: In accordance with the joint stipulation for dismissal between plaintiff and defendant Pneumo Abex LLC [Doc. #320 ], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of this action against defendant Pneumo Abex LLC, without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties shall bear their own costs. Pneumo Abex Corporation terminated.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/02/16. (KKS)
December 1, 2016 Filing 321 MOTION for Leave to File a First Amended Peition by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed First Amended Peition, #2 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Leave to File First Amended Petition)(Hulla, Timothy)
December 1, 2016 Filing 320 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Party Pneumo Abex LLC by Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Titzer, Ross)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 319. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Wed Nov 30 12:52:20 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In accordance with the joint stipulation for dismissal between plaintiff and defendant Cummins, Inc. [Doc. #318 ], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of this action against defendant Cummins, Inc., without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties shall bear their own costs. Cummins, Inc. terminated.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/30/16. (KKS)
November 29, 2016 Filing 318 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Cummins, Inc.. (Lindsey, Nathan)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 316, 317. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Mon Nov 21 11:49:15 CST 2016 (Bernsen, John)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER: In accordance with the notice of dismissal filed by defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation [Doc. #311 ], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal the crossclaims of defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation against defendant Bridgestone Americas, Inc., without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(c)(1). The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/21/16. (JAB)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER: In accordance with the joint stipulation for dismissal between plaintiff and defendant J.P. Bushnnell Packing Supply Co. [Doc. #315 ], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of this action against defendant J.P. Bushnnell Packing Supply Co. without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) (ii). The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/21/16. (JAB)
November 17, 2016 Filing 315 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Defendant JP Bushnell Packing Supply Company, Inc.. (Sinars, Douglas)
November 8, 2016 Filing 314 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #313 Joint MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Claims against Greene, Tweed & Co. Inc., and Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Combined Motion to Dismiss all Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants filed by Cross Defendants Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Defendant Greene Tweed & Co Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Benoist, Ashley)
November 8, 2016 Filing 313 Joint MOTION to Dismiss :Plaintiff's Claims against Greene, Tweed & Co. Inc., and Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.'s Combined Motion to Dismiss all Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants by Cross Defendants Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Greene Tweed & Co Inc., Defendant Greene Tweed & Co Inc.. (Benoist, Ashley)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 310,312. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Tue Nov 8 11:52:00 CST 2016 (Olliges, Chelsea)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant BW/IP, Inc. The plaintiff shall bear the costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/8/2016. (CLO)
November 8, 2016 Filing 311 MOTION to Dismiss :Cross-Claim by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Cross Claimant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant BW/IP to dismiss [Doc. #298 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/8/2016. (CLO)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 308,309. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Tue Nov 8 11:01:52 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant CBS for certification of a question for interlocutory appeal is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/7/2016. (CLO)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for voluntary dismissal [#296 ] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of plaintiffs claims against defendant FMC Corporation without prejudice and reflecting the dismissal of the crossclaims of defendant FMC Corporation against all other defendants without prejudice. All crossclaims against defendant FMC Corporation remain pending. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 11/7/2016. (CLO)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 307. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Mon Oct 17 08:35:01 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #305 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Wilson, Benjamin) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/17/16. (JAB)
October 7, 2016 Filing 306 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Benjamin)
October 5, 2016 Filing 305 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Wilson, Benjamin)
October 4, 2016 Filing 304 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R. Hunsaker for Defendants Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (Hunsaker, Scott)
September 26, 2016 Filing 303 (DISCOVERY DOCUMENT deleted; attorney notified via email) WITNESS LIST by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Hulla, Timothy) Modified on 9/27/2016 (CLO).
September 22, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Virginia M. Giokaris. (Giokaris, Virginia)
September 22, 2016 Filing 301 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Virginia M. Giokaris. The firm name has been updated. (Giokaris, Virginia) Modified on 9/26/2016 (LMR).
September 22, 2016 Filing 300 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Nathan Asher Lindsey. (Lindsey, Nathan)
September 22, 2016 Filing 299 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Nathan Asher Lindsey. The firm name has been updated. (Lindsey, Nathan) Modified on 9/26/2016 (LMR).
September 9, 2016 Filing 298 MOTION to Dismiss :Based on Collateral Estoppel by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Benoist, Ashley)
September 6, 2016 Filing 297 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. . (Hulla, Timothy)
August 31, 2016 Filing 296 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Riegerix, Joseph)
August 31, 2016 Filing 295 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph Ryan Riegerix for Defendant FMC Corporation. (Riegerix, Joseph)
August 26, 2016 Filing 294 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory Douglas DeBeer for Defendant Paccar, Inc.. (DeBeer, Gregory)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 293. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification. Fri Aug 26 14:08:39 CDT 2016 (Olliges, Chelsea)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion to dismiss [Doc. #292 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendant PACCAR, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/26/2016. (CLO)
August 26, 2016 Filing 292 JOINT NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paccar, Inc. (DeBeer, Gregory)
August 24, 2016 Filing 291 MOTION to Amend/Correct #277 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction to Allow for Interlocutory Appeal by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 290. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Tue Aug 23 16:00:13 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions to dismiss cross-claims of defendants Aurora Pump Company, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., and Weil-McLain Company [Docs. #285 , #286 , #287 ] are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all cross-claims against Aurora Pump Company, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., and Weil-McLain Company are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of Aurora Pump Company, Illinois Tool Works, Inc., and Weil-McLain Company from this action. The parties shall bear their own costs.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/23/16. (KKS)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 289. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Thu Aug 18 11:24:17 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint to add a new defendant [Doc. #288 ] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/18/16. (KKS)
August 17, 2016 Filing 288 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Party by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Hulla, Timothy)
August 9, 2016 Filing 287 MOTION to Dismiss :ALL CROSS-CLAIMS OF CO-DEFENDANTS by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Riley, Melanie)
August 9, 2016 Filing 286 MOTION to Dismiss :Cross-claims of Co-Defendants and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Weil-Mclain Company. (Benoist, Ashley)
August 9, 2016 Filing 285 MOTION to Dismiss :all Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. (Benoist, Ashley)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 277-284. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Fri Aug 5 15:26:44 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 SCHEDULING PLAN ORDER: (SEE ORDER) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/6/2016.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL : In accordance with the Memorandum and Order filed herewith this date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed as to defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, as successor the former Vellumoid Division of Federal-Mogul and as to defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, as successor to Felt-Products Manufacturing Co., for lack of personal jurisdiction.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Injury Trust, as successor the former Vellumoid Division of Federal-Mogul and as successor to Felt-Products Manufacturing Co., to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [Docs. #271, 272] are granted.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of defendants Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., Taco, Inc., Young Group, Ltd., and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. [Docs. # #210 , #248 , #254 , #258 , #265 ] are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc. against every other defendant are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of all defendants against Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., Taco, Inc., Young Group, Ltd., and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/2016. (CLO)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of defendants Burnham, LLC and Lamons Gasket Company to dismiss without prejudice their cross-claims against defendant Western Auto Supply Company [Docs. # #264 , #266 ] are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of defendants Burnham, LLC and Lamons Gasket Company against defendant Western Auto Supply Company are dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions to dismiss of plaintiff and defendants BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, Ford Motor Company, General Gasket Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., and Kelsey-Hayes Company [Docs. #261, 262, 267, 268, 274] are granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of defendants BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, Ford Motor Company, General Gasket Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., and Kelsey-Hayes Company against each other and against any other defendant are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [Doc. #233] is moot. The parties shall bear their own costs.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file a response to CBS's motion [Doc. #269 ] is denied without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant CBS Corporation to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [Doc. #96 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 276. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Aug 5 12:48:58 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to remand [Doc. #200 ] is denied.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/5/16. (KKS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Warren Pumps, LLC.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Cleaver Brooks Inc.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Burnham Commerical Boilers.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Lamons Gasket Company.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Aurora Pump Company.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Georgia Pacific, LLC. (NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM All Defendants filed by Caterpillar, Inc. (NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants filed by Trane US, Inc..(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 28, 2016 CROSSCLAIM against defendants filed by Crane Co.(NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED; FOR COURT PURPOSES ONLY IN ORDER TO CORRECT THE DOCKET).(KXS)
July 21, 2016 Filing 275 STIPULATION for Dismissal of the Cross-Claims of Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc. Against Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations by Cross Defendants PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., Cross Claimant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.. (Hurtt, Robert)
June 20, 2016 Filing 274 MOTION to Dismiss filed as a STIPULATION /Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Ford Motor Company by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Loomer, Rodney) Modified event on 6/21/2016 (KKS).
June 17, 2016 Filing 273 SECOND Letter to attorney Demetrious Zacharopoulos from Deputy Clerk re: Admission Pro Hac Vice (JAB)
June 16, 2016 Filing 272 MOTION for Leave to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Valentino, Jennifer)
June 16, 2016 Filing 271 MOTION for Leave to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Valentino, Jennifer)
June 15, 2016 Filing 270 RESPONSE to Motion re #269 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant CBS Corporation's Joiner of Removal filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
June 9, 2016 ***REMARK: Attorney Patrick M. Grand will not be representing JP Bushnell Packing Supply Company, Inc. in this case and will be terminated on the docket. (JAB)
June 8, 2016 Filing 269 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant CBS Corporation's Joiner of Removal by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiff's Response to CBS Corporation's Joiner of Removal, #2 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support)(Hulla, Timothy)
June 1, 2016 ***REMARK: Attorney Luke Pfeifer will not be representing Berj Hovsepian in this case and will be terminated on the docket. (JAB)
May 25, 2016 Filing 268 MOTION to Dismiss filed as a NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC (Voss, Andrew) Modified event to a Motion on 6/21/2016 (KKS).
May 25, 2016 Filing 267 MOTION to Dismiss filed as a NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kelsey Hayes Co. (Voss, Andrew) Modified event to a Motion on 6/21/2016 (KKS).
May 24, 2016 Filing 266 MOTION to Dismiss :Cross-Claim against Defendant Western Auto by Cross Claimant Burnham Commerical Boilers. (Sondag, Trevor)
May 23, 2016 Filing 265 MOTION to Dismiss :Cross-Claims Against Co-Defendants and Combined Motion to Dismiss All Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants and Memorandum in Support by Cross Defendants PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., Cross Claimant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.. (Beshore, Steven)
May 20, 2016 Filing 264 MOTION to Dismiss Party Crossclaims against Western Auto Supply Company by Cross Defendant Lamons Gasket Company. (Lee, Paul)
May 19, 2016 Filing 263 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
May 19, 2016 Filing 262 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Cross Defendants General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, General Gasket Corporation, Defendant General Gasket Corporation. (Bronsky, Albert)
May 18, 2016 Filing 261 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party IMO Industries, Inc. by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bigham, Matthew)
May 16, 2016 Filing 260 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M. Voss for Defendant Maremont Corporation. (Voss, Andrew)
May 13, 2016 Filing 259 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Young Group Ltd.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 258 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Dismiss Defendants' Cross-Claims :Dismiss Defendants' Cross-Claims by Defendant Young Group Ltd.. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 257 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Daniel Woodard for Defendant Young Group Ltd.. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 256 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon A. Santangelo for Defendant Young Group Ltd.. (Santangelo, Jon)
May 13, 2016 Filing 255 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Dismiss Defendants' Cross-Claims :Defendants' Counter-Claims by Defendant Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 253 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Daniel Woodard for Defendant Young Group Ltd.. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 252 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon A. Santangelo for Defendant Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. (Santangelo, Jon)
May 13, 2016 Filing 251 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Daniel Woodard for Defendant Taco, Inc.. (Woodard, Benjamin) Modified on 5/16/2016-Document deleted due to attorney filing error-document re-filed as doc # 253 (JAB).
May 13, 2016 Filing 250 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon A. Santangelo for Defendant Taco, Inc.. (Santangelo, Jon) Modified on 5/16/2016-Document deleted due to attorney filing error-document re-filed as doc # 252. (JAB).
May 13, 2016 Filing 249 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Taco, Inc.. Parent companies: Taco Group Holdings, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 248 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support to Dismiss Defendants' Cross-Claims :Defendants' Cross-Claims by Defendant Taco, Inc.. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 247 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Daniel Woodard for Defendant Taco, Inc.. (Woodard, Benjamin)
May 13, 2016 Filing 246 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon A. Santangelo for Defendant Taco, Inc.. (Santangelo, Jon)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 244, 245. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Thu May 12 09:27:26 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for relief [Doc. #240 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/12/16. (JAB)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant CBS Corporation for oral argument [Doc. #242 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/12/16. (JAB)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 243. Mailed to parties not notified electronically. Wed May 11 10:21:15 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #241 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Defendant Crane Co.. ( Response to Court due by 5/19/2016.). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/11/16. (KKS)
May 10, 2016 Filing 242 MOTION for Hearing re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 10, 2016 Filing 241 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
May 10, 2016 Filing 240 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hulla, Timothy)
May 10, 2016 Filing 239 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel G. Donahue for Cross Defendants CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, CBS Corporation, Defendant CBS Corporation. (Donahue, Daniel)
May 9, 2016 Filing 238 AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Hulla, Timothy) Modified text on 5/9/2016 (KKS).
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 237. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Mon May 9 11:03:38 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #235 MOTION for Leave to Join Defendant Crane Co. Removal and File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/9/16. (JAB)
May 6, 2016 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition re #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - February 25, 2016 Deposition of Berj A. Hovsepian, #2 Exhibit B - June 14, 2012 Deposition of Berj A. Hovsepian, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Roger B. Horne, Jr., #4 Exhibit D - MIL-T-17523B, #5 Exhibit E - General Specifications for Machinery for Ships of the US Navy, #6 Exhibit F - MIL-M-15071E, #7 Exhibit G - Report of Samuel A. Forman)(Dauphin, Michael)
May 6, 2016 Filing 235 MOTION for Leave to Join Defendant Crane Co. Removal and File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 234. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Fri May 6 12:07:32 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #232 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response in Opposition to CBS Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Hulla, Timothy) ; ORDERED DENIED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/6/16. (JAB)
May 6, 2016 Filing 233 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Voss, Andrew)
May 5, 2016 Filing 232 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response in Opposition to CBS Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Hulla, Timothy)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 229,230,231. Mailed to parties not notified electronically. Thu May 5 13:44:33 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions to dismiss of plaintiff and defendants Aurora Pump Company, Certainteed Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, and Riley Stoker Corporation [Docs. # #211 , #212 , #213 , #214 ] are granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants Aurora Pump Company, Certainteed Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, and Riley Stoker Corporation are dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of defendants Aurora Pump Company, Certainteed Corporation, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, and Riley Stoker Corporation against each other and against any other defendant are dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss of defendant Daimler Trucks North America, LLC [Doc. #24 ] is moot. All other claims and cross-claims remain pending. The parties shall bear their own costs.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/5/16. (KKS)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss of plaintiff and defendant Western Auto Supply Company [Doc. #226 ] is granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendant Western Auto Supply Company are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of defendant Western Auto Supply Company against any other defendant are dismissed without prejudice. All other claims and cross-claims remain pending. The parties shall bear their own costs.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/5/16. (KKS)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER re ; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to apply Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(c)(1)(B) [Doc. #192 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any crossclaim, counterclaim, avoidance, or affirmative defense in those pleadings and replies to them will be treated as denied or avoided by all other parties. MOTION for Leave to Institute Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) and Enter an Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Crane Co.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/5/16. (KKS)
May 4, 2016 Filing 228 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM and Jury Trial Demand against defendant All Plaintiffs by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Meyer, Julie)
May 4, 2016 Filing 227 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Parties by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Flatt, Gregory)
May 4, 2016 Filing 226 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Vantine, Marcie)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 224, 225 . Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Tue May 3 15:39:25 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Docket Text ORDER: as to Warren Pumps, LLC Re: #220 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Meyer, Julie) filed by Warren Pumps, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED, Warren Pumps, LLC answer due 5/4/2016. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/3/16. (JAB)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #219 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP ;substituted for:Hinshaw & Culbertson by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.(Tayyab, Julia) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/3/16. (JAB)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 221, 222, 223. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Mon May 2 15:29:03 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Western Auto Supply Company [Doc. #205 ] is moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/2/16. (JAB)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Genuine Parts Company to dismiss [Doc. #174 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims by all other defendants against cross-defendant Genuine Parts Company are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Genuine Parts Company is dismissed from this action. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/2/16. (JAB)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions to dismiss cross-claims [Docs. # #193 , #194 , #198 , #199 ] are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of Gould Pumps, Inc., Burnham, LLC, Crane Co., Ingersoll Rand Company, and Lamons Gasket Company against cross-defendants Taco, Inc., Young Group Ltd., and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/2/16. (JAB)
May 2, 2016 Filing 220 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
May 2, 2016 Filing 219 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP ;substituted for:Hinshaw & Culbertson by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tayyab, Julia)
April 29, 2016 Filing 218 ENTRY of Appearance by Douglas Michael Sinars for Defendant JP Bushnell Packing Supply Company, Inc.. (Sinars, Douglas)
April 29, 2016 Filing 217 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 215. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Fri Apr 29 13:50:27 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
April 29, 2016 Filing 216 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC.. (Voss, Andrew)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #208 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court, #201 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin) ; ORDERED GRANTED, ( Response to Court due by 5/12/2016.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/29/16. (JAB)
April 28, 2016 Filing 214 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Party Aurora Pump Co. by Cross Defendants Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Aurora Pump Company, Cross Claimant Aurora Pump Company, Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Riley, Melanie) Modified text on 4/28/2016 (KKS).
April 28, 2016 Filing 213 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party for VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION by Cross Defendants Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 28, 2016 Filing 212 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party for VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, f/k/a FREIGHTLINER, LLC by Cross Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 28, 2016 Filing 211 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party for VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT RILEY STOKER CORPORATION by Defendant Riley Power, Inc., Cross Defendants Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 28, 2016 Filing 210 MOTION to Dismiss :Cross-claims of Co-Defendants and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Continental Teves, Inc... (Wiese, Richard)
April 28, 2016 Filing 209 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT CUMMINS INC. filed as a SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice (Other), Supplement of State Court Pleading by Defendant Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #83)(Giokaris, Virginia) Modified text on 4/29/2016 (KKS).
April 28, 2016 Filing 208 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court, #201 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Defendant Crane Co.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 27, 2016 Filing 207 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan Asher Lindsey for Defendant Cummins, Inc.. (Lindsey, Nathan)
April 27, 2016 Filing 206 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cummins, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Giokaris, Virginia)
April 27, 2016 Filing 205 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Vantine, Marcie)
April 27, 2016 Filing 204 ENTRY of Appearance by Virginia M. Giokaris for Defendant Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #83)(Giokaris, Virginia) Modified on 4/28/2016 (KKS). (4/28/16: emailed attorney and asked the supplement be filed as a separate document in order to keep the record clear.)
April 27, 2016 Filing 203 ENTRY of Appearance by Marcie J. Vantine for Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (Vantine, Marcie)
April 27, 2016 Filing 202 2nd Letter to attorney Patrick Grand from Deputy Clerk re: admission pro hac vice (KMS)
April 25, 2016 Filing 201 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court filed by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Hulla, Timothy)
April 25, 2016 Filing 200 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to State Court by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Hulla, Timothy)
April 25, 2016 Filing 199 MOTION to Dismiss Party Crossclaims against Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, and Taco, Inc. by Cross Defendant Lamons Gasket Company. (Lee, Paul)
April 25, 2016 Filing 198 MOTION to Dismiss :Crossclaims against Taco Inc., Young Group Ltd., and Young Insulation of St. Louis by Defendants Crane Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 22, 2016 Filing 197 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Hulla, Timothy)
April 22, 2016 Filing 196 NOTICE Withdrawal of Counsel: by Defendant Greene Tweed & Co Inc. (Williams, James)
April 22, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE Withdrawal of Counsel: by Defendant Flowserve Corporation BW/IP, INC., INCORRECTLY NAMED AS FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC. fka BYRON JACKSON PUMP DIVISION (Williams, James)
April 21, 2016 Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss :cross-claims against defendants Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation of St. Louis, and Taco, Inc. by Defendant Burnham Commerical Boilers. (Sondag, Trevor)
April 21, 2016 Filing 193 MOTION to Dismiss :cross-claims against defendants Young Group, Ltd., Young Insulation of St. Louis and Taco, Inc. by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Sondag, Trevor)
April 19, 2016 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to Institute Federal Rule 5(c)(1)(B) and Enter an Order Regarding Crossclaims, Answers to Crossclaims, and Affirmative Defenses to Crossclaims by Defendants Crane Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Geraci, Carl)
April 19, 2016 Filing 191 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney ;attorney/firm James R. Williams, Esq. by Defendant Continental Teves, Inc... (Williams, James) Modified on 4/20/2016-changed event to notice (JAB).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 189,190. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Mon Apr 18 12:14:45 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss of plaintiff and defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. [Doc. #145 ] is granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of all other defendants against defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/18/16. (JAB)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss of plaintiff and defendant Zurn Industries, LLC [Doc. #146 ] is granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendant Zurn Industries, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of defendant Zurn Industries, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims of all other defendants against defendant Zurn Industries, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/18/16. (JAB)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 188. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Mon Apr 18 12:01:57 CDT 2016 (Bernsen, John)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of plaintiffs claims against defendants Taco, Inc., Young Group Ltd. f/k/a Young Sales Corp., and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc., without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/18/16. (JAB)
April 15, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Young Insulation Group of St. Louis Inc. (Hulla, Timothy)
April 15, 2016 Filing 186 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Young Group Ltd (Hulla, Timothy)
April 15, 2016 Filing 185 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Defendant Taco, Inc. (Hulla, Timothy)
April 14, 2016 Filing 184 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Greene Tweed & Co Inc.. Subsidiaries: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. is an indirect, wholly-owned subsidiary of GT Global Holdings, LLC., Publicly held company: There is no publicly held corporation that owns ten percent (10%) or more of Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc.'s stock,. (Benoist, Ashley)
April 14, 2016 Filing 183 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. Subsidiaries: BW/IP, Inc., is a division of Flowserve Corporation, which is is a publicly traded corporation, Publicly held company: BW/IP, Inc. is not a publicly traded corporation,. (Benoist, Ashley)
April 13, 2016 Filing 182 Defendant Cleaver-Books, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM Answer to all crossclaims and crossclaims against defendant All Defendants by Cleaver Brooks Inc..(McGuire, Timothy)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 176,177,178,179,180,181. Mailed to parties not notified electronically. Wed Apr 13 12:11:16 CDT 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER: In accordance with plaintiff's notice of dismissal of his claims against Genuine Parts Company, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of plaintiff's claims against defendant Genuine Parts Company without prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The parties shall bear their own costs. Genuine Parts Company terminated.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/16. (KKS)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL : In accordance with the Memorandum and Order filed herewith this date, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiffs claims against defendants Autozone, Inc.; Bridgestone Americas, Inc.; Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC; Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., f/k/a Motion Control Industries, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Carlisle Corporation; Carrier Corporation; Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., f/k/a Continental Teves, Inc.; Conwed Corporation; The Dow Chemical Company; Eaton Corporation, as successor-in- interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc.; Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to C.H. Wheeler; General Electric Company; The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Grinnell, LLC; Illinois Tool Works, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Devcon Corporation; ITT Corporation, f/k/a ITT Industries, Inc.; The J.R. Clarkson Company, LLC, successor to The Kunkle Valve Company, and successor to J.E. Lonergan Company; Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.; Lufkin Industries, Inc.; Mack Trucks, Inc.; PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc., f/k/a Azko Nobel Paints, LLC, d/b/a The Glidden Company; Sprinkmann Sons Corporation; Union Carbide Corporation; Weil- McClain Company; and Whitney Automotive Group, Inc., f/k/a J.C. Whitney & Co. are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/16. (KKS)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [Docs. #11, 13, 14, 15, 17, 18, 21, 22, 25, 26, 29, 30, 31, 32, 34, 35, 36, 37, 38, 39, 47, 49, 51, 54, and 121] are granted. A separate order of partial dismissal will issue.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/16. (KKS)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER #164 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time to respond to CBS Corporation's motion to dismiss [Doc. #164 ] is granted. The plaintiff's response is due on April 22, 2016. MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Berj Hovsepian ( Response to Court due by 4/22/2016.). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/16. (KKS)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motions [Docs. #9, 10, 12, 16, 19, 20, 27, 28, 33, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 48, 50, 52, 53, 55, 56] are moot. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/16. (KKS)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss of plaintiff and defendants Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., and Trane U.S., Inc. [Doc. #166 ] is granted. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants Georgia- Pacific, LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., and Trane U.S., Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-claims by defendants Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Caterpillar, Inc., and Trane U.S., Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/13/16. (JAB)
April 13, 2016 ***REMARK: Spoke with Laci Whitley and she will not be representing Berj Hovsepian in this case. She will be termed. (KMS)
April 12, 2016 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #174 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Cross Claims filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Daniels, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 174 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Cross Claims by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Daniels, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 173 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F. Daniels for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Daniels, Michael)
April 12, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE Dismissal Without Prejudice of Lufkin Industries, Inc.: by Defendant Lufkin Industries, Inc. (Blaser, Melvin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 171 ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #170 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Sondag, Trevor)
April 11, 2016 Filing 170 ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #143 Answer to Crossclaim,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Burnham Commerical Boilers.(Sondag, Trevor)
April 11, 2016 Filing 169 ENTRY of Appearance by Agota Peterfy for Cross Defendants John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Defendant John Crane, Inc.. (Peterfy, Agota)
April 11, 2016 Filing 168 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Defendant John Crane, Inc.. Parent companies: John Crane Group, LTD (UK), Subsidiaries: Smith Groups Inter. Holdings, Ltd., Publicly held company: Smiths Group PLC,. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 11, 2016 Filing 167 ENTRY of Appearance by Albert J. Bronsky for Cross Defendants John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Defendant John Crane, Inc.. (Bronsky, Albert)
April 11, 2016 Filing 166 MOTION to Dismiss Party Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia Pacific Company, and Trane US Inc. by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Trane US, Inc.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 11, 2016 Filing 165 ENTRY of Appearance by Melvin Tucker Blaser for Defendant Lufkin Industries, Inc.. (Blaser, Melvin)
April 8, 2016 Filing 164 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Hulla, Timothy)
April 8, 2016 Filing 163 (Document deleted-See corrected entry #170 ) ANSWER to Complaint by Burnham Commerical Boilers.(Sondag, Trevor) Modified on 4/11/2016 (KKS).
April 8, 2016 Filing 162 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Burnham Commerical Boilers. Parent companies: Burnham Holdings, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sondag, Trevor)
April 8, 2016 Filing 161 (Document deleted-See corrected entry # 171]) ANSWER to Complaint by Goulds Pumps, Inc..(Sondag, Trevor) Modified on 4/11/2016 (KKS).
April 8, 2016 Filing 160 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. Parent companies: ITT CORPORATION, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sondag, Trevor)
April 7, 2016 Filing 159 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. Parent companies: Daimler Trucks North America LLC is a limited liability company with Daimler North America Corporation as its sole member, which is wholly owned by Daimler AG.,. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 7, 2016 Filing 158 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Subsidiaries: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation a publicy-traded corporation,. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 7, 2016 Filing 157 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. Parent companies: CertainTeed is an indirect, wholly-owned subsidiary of Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Paris, France, Subsidiaries: The Wendel Group, Paris, France owns more than 10% of the stock of Compagnie de Saint-Gobain,. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 7, 2016 Filing 156 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Riley Power, Inc., Cross Defendants Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc.. Parent companies: Riley Stoker corporation is a privately-held corporation, indirectly and wholly owned by Babcock Power, Inc., a Delaware Corporation and privately-held company. There is no publicly-held corporation which owns 10% or more of Riley Stoker Corporation's stock.,. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 7, 2016 Filing 155 MOTION for Disclosure by Cross Defendants Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory) Modified on 4/8/2016- Document deleted due to attorney filing error. Document refiled as doc # 157 (JAB).
April 7, 2016 Filing 154 MOTION for Disclosure by Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory) Modified on 4/8/2016-Document deleted due to attorney filing error. Document refiled as doc # 158 (JAB).
April 7, 2016 Filing 153 MOTION for Disclosure by Cross Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Flatt, Gregory) Modified on 4/8/2016-Document deleted due to attorney filing error. Document refiled as doc # 159 (JAB).
April 7, 2016 Filing 152 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Cross Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 7, 2016 Filing 151 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Cross Defendants Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 7, 2016 Filing 150 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Cross Defendants Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 7, 2016 Filing 149 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory C. Flatt for Defendant Riley Power, Inc., Cross Defendants Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Riley Power, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 148. sent to parties not set up for electronic notification Wed Apr 6 15:39:26 CDT 2016 (Scheele, Kara)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Docket Text ORDER Re: #135 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Rebecca Nickelson and Alex Belotserkovsky by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/6/2016. (KMS)
April 6, 2016 Filing 147 ENTRY of Appearance by Leo W. Nelsen, Jr for Defendant Lamons Gasket Company. (Nelsen, Leo)
April 6, 2016 Filing 146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Zurn Industries, LLC and Zurn Industries, LLC's Combined Motion to Dismiss All Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Irwin, William)
April 6, 2016 Filing 145 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Gardner Denver, Inc. and Gardner Denver, Inc.'s Combined Motion to Dismiss all Cross-Claims of Co-Defendants and Memorandum in Support by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Irwin, William)
April 6, 2016 Filing 144 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC.. (Irwin, William)
April 6, 2016 Filing 143 ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , ANSWER to #100 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #132 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #119 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #109 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Lamons Gasket Company.(Lee, Paul)
April 6, 2016 Filing 142 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc... (Irwin, William)
April 6, 2016 Filing 141 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendant Lamons Gasket Company.. (Lee, Paul)
April 6, 2016 Filing 140 ENTRY of Appearance by William R. Irwin for Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Irwin, William)
April 6, 2016 Filing 139 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul B. Lee for Cross Defendant Lamons Gasket Company. (Lee, Paul)
April 6, 2016 Filing 138 ENTRY of Appearance by William R. Irwin for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Irwin, William)
April 6, 2016 Filing 137 DEFENDANT AURORA PUMP COMPANY'S ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM AND AURORA PUMP COMPANY'S ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS against defendant Aurora Pump Company by Aurora Pump Company.(McGinley, Michael)
April 6, 2016 Filing 136 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael P. McGinley for Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (McGinley, Michael)
April 5, 2016 Filing 135 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Rebecca Nickelson and Alex Belotserkovsky by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Crane Co., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 5, 2016 Filing 134 STIPULATION for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Murphy, Patrick)
April 5, 2016 Filing 133 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.. Parent companies: PPG Industries Securities, LLC; PPG Capital LLC; PPG Industries, Inc., Subsidiaries: Societe Polynesienne de Peintures Fuller; The Coatings Alliance, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Hurtt, Robert)
April 5, 2016 Filing 132 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc..(Hurtt, Robert)
April 4, 2016 Filing 131 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr for Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.. (Hurtt, Robert)
April 4, 2016 Filing 130 ENTRY of Appearance by Georgiann Oliver for Cross Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Oliver, Georgiann)
April 4, 2016 Filing 129 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Cross Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Parent companies: MetLife, Inc.,. (Joley, Charles)
April 4, 2016 Filing 128 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cross Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Joley, Charles)
April 4, 2016 Filing 127 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition and to Cross-Claims of Any and All Other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants With Jury Demand Endorsed Thereon by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Joley, Charles)
April 4, 2016 Filing 126 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant CBS Corporation. Parent companies: National Amusements, Inc. and its wholly-owned subsidiary, NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Publicly held company: Yes,. (Dauphin, Michael)
April 4, 2016 Filing 125 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles L. Joley for Cross Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Joley, Charles)
April 4, 2016 Filing 124 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.. Parent companies: Crown Holdings, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Crown Holdings, Inc.,. (Maassen, Stephen)
April 4, 2016 Filing 123 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Maassen, Stephen)
April 4, 2016 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #121 MOTION to Dismiss :for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Conwed Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert Crowson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - J. Dierker Memo and Order dated 011215, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - J. Dowd Order dated 080615)(Sondag, Trevor)
April 4, 2016 Filing 121 MOTION to Dismiss :for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Conwed Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Robert Crowson)(Sondag, Trevor)
April 4, 2016 Filing 120 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conwed Corporation. Parent companies: Leucadia LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Sondag, Trevor)
April 1, 2016 Filing 119 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Georgia Pacific, LLC.(Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 118 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Georgia Pacific, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 117 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Trane US, Inc.. Parent companies: Ingersoll Rand PLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Ingersoll Rand PLC,. (Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 116 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. Parent companies: Ingersoll Rand PLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Ingersoll Rand PLC,. (Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 115 ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin John Wilson for Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (Wilson, Benjamin)
April 1, 2016 Filing 114 ENTRY of Appearance by Carl J. Geraci for Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 113 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kidd, Anita) Modified on 4/4/2016-corrected event and termed motion (JAB).
April 1, 2016 Filing 112 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond) Modified on 4/4/2016-corrected event and termed motion (JAB).
April 1, 2016 Filing 111 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Meyer, Julie)
April 1, 2016 Filing 110 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant General Electric Company. (Meyer, Julie)
April 1, 2016 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Caterpillar, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 108 ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie R. King for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (King, Melanie)
April 1, 2016 Filing 107 ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie R. King for Defendant General Electric Company. (King, Melanie)
April 1, 2016 Filing 106 ENTRY of Appearance by Anita Maria Kidd for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kidd, Anita)
April 1, 2016 Filing 105 ENTRY of Appearance by Anita Maria Kidd for Defendant General Electric Company. (Kidd, Anita)
April 1, 2016 Filing 104 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Fournie, Raymond)
April 1, 2016 Filing 103 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond R. Fournie for Defendant General Electric Company. (Fournie, Raymond)
April 1, 2016 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Trane US, Inc..(Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Crane Co..(Geraci, Carl)
April 1, 2016 Filing 99 ENTRY of Appearance by Beth Kamp Veath for Defendant Autozone, Inc.. (Veath, Beth)
April 1, 2016 Filing 98 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cleaver Brooks Inc.. Parent companies: Cleaver Holdings, Inc.,. (McGuire, Timothy)
April 1, 2016 Filing 97 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy A. McGuire for Defendant Cleaver Brooks Inc.. (McGuire, Timothy)
April 1, 2016 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
April 1, 2016 Filing 95 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy Paul Hulla for Plaintiff Berj Hovsepian. (Hulla, Timothy)
March 30, 2016 Filing 94 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc..(JAB)
March 30, 2016 Filing 93 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Continental Teves, Inc... Parent companies: No publicly held company owns 10% or more of Continental Automotive Systems, Inc.; however, Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., f/k/a Continental Teves, Inc., is an indirect subsidiary of Continental Aktiengesellschaft, a German public corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No publicly held company owns 10% or more of Continental Automotive Systems, Inc.; however, Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., f/k/a Continental Teves, Inc., is an indirect subsidiary of Continental Aktiengesellschaft, a German public corporation,. (Williams, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 92 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. Parent companies: Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Subsidiaries: Gypsum Carrier, Inc., Publicly held company: None,. (Giokaris, Virginia)
March 30, 2016 Filing 91 ENTRY of Appearance by Virginia M. Giokaris for Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #82)(Giokaris, Virginia)
March 30, 2016 Filing 90 ENTRY of Appearance by James Russell Williams for Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Williams, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 89 ENTRY of Appearance by James Russell Williams for Defendant Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. (Williams, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 88 ENTRY of Appearance by James Russell Williams for Defendant Greene Tweed & Co Inc.. (Williams, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 87 ENTRY of Appearance by James Russell Williams for Defendant Weil-Mclain Company. (Williams, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 86 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E. Benoist for Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Benoist, Ashley)
March 30, 2016 Filing 85 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E. Benoist for Defendant Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. (Benoist, Ashley)
March 30, 2016 Filing 84 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E. Benoist for Defendant Greene Tweed & Co Inc.. (Benoist, Ashley)
March 30, 2016 Filing 83 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E. Benoist for Defendant Weil-Mclain Company. (Benoist, Ashley)
March 30, 2016 Filing 82 ENTRY of Appearance by James Russell Williams for Defendant Continental Teves, Inc... (Williams, James)
March 30, 2016 Filing 81 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard William Wiese for Defendant Continental Teves, Inc... (Wiese, Richard)
March 30, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Crane Co. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Service List)(Wilson, Benjamin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 79 ENTRY of Appearance by Trevor Alan Sondag for Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Sondag, Trevor)
March 30, 2016 Filing 78 ENTRY of Appearance by Trevor Alan Sondag for Defendant Conwed Corporation. (Sondag, Trevor)
March 30, 2016 Filing 77 ENTRY of Appearance by Trevor Alan Sondag for Defendant Burnham Commerical Boilers. (Sondag, Trevor)
March 30, 2016 Filing 76 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Dow Chemical Company, The.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2016 Filing 75 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash for Defendant Dow Chemical Company, The. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2016 Filing 74 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation.. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2016 Filing 73 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Bash for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Bash, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2016 Filing 72 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Zimmerman, Justin)
March 30, 2016 Filing 71 ENTRY of Appearance by Justin S. Zimmerman for Defendant Dow Chemical Company, The. (Zimmerman, Justin)
March 29, 2016 Filing 70 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael R. Dauphin for Defendant CBS Corporation. (Dauphin, Michael)
March 29, 2016 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Carol E. Jackson. (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 69 Letter to attorney Demetrious Zacharapoulos from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 68 Letter to attorney David W. Ybarra from Deputy Clerk re: Admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 67 Letter to attorney Laci M. Whitley from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 66 Letter to attorney April A. Vesely from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 65 Letter to attorney Kent Plotner from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 64 Letter to attorney Luke Pfeifer from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 63 Letter to attorney Rebecca Nickelson from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 62 Letter to attorney Nathan Lindsey from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 61 Letter to attorney Patrick M. Grand from Deputy Clerk re: admission pro hac vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 60 Letter to attorney Dennis Graber from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 59 Letter to attorney Philip M. Eisele from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 58 Letter to attorney Alex Belotserkovsky from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
March 29, 2016 Filing 57 Letter to attorney Shannon R. Summers from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the Eastern District of Missouri (JWD)
March 28, 2016 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. Parent companies: Pentair, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Pentair,. (Riley, Melanie)
March 28, 2016 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie E. Riley for Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Riley, Melanie)
March 25, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Young Group Ltd.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Whitney Automotive Group Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Weil-Mclain Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Taco, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Sprinkmann Sons Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #45 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Riley Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts)(JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Riley Power, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Riley Power, Inc. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to Transfer Case to Proper Venue by Defendant Paccar, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike #8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Paccar, Inc. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Maremont Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Mack Trucks Inc. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Lufkin Industries, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Kelly Moore Paint Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant J.R. Clarkson Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant ITT Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Illinois Tool Works, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Conspiracy Count by Defendant Honeywell International Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant General Electric Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Inspection and Copying of Plaintiff's Medical Records by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer Case to Circuit Court of St. Louis County by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Eaton Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Dow Chemical Company, The. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Conwed Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Continental Teves, Inc... (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Certain-Teed Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Strike, MOTION to Transfer Case, Motion for Consolidation of Defenses in Motion by Defendants Caterpillar, Inc., Georgia Pacific, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Motion Control Industries, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Bridgestone Americas, Inc. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Autozone, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (JWD)
March 25, 2016 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St Louis City, filed by Berj Hovsepian.(MFG)
March 25, 2016 Receipt 4644056151 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of HEPLER AND BROOM (CCAM)
March 25, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Crane Co. Sent To: Plaintiff (Wilson, Benjamin)
March 25, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE Appearance: by Defendant Crane Co. (Geraci, Carl)
March 25, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE Appearance: by Defendant Crane Co. (Wilson, Benjamin)
March 25, 2016 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Crane Co... (Wilson, Benjamin)
March 25, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE by Defendant Crane Co. to Remove Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiff Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 Affidavit of Pantaleoni, #4 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Sargent Part 1, #5 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Sargent Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Sargent Part 3, #7 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Sargent Part 4, #8 Exhibit 4 Affidavit of Sargent Part 5, #9 Exhibit 5 Affidavit of Forman Part 1, #10 Exhibit 5 Affidavit of Forman Part 2, #11 Exhibit 5 Affidavit of Forman Part 3, #12 Exhibit 5 Affidavit of Forman Part 4, #13 Exhibit 6 Original Filing Form, #14 Exhibit 7 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Exhibit 8 Entries of Appearance, #16 Exhibit 9 Summonses Part 1, #17 Exhibit 10 Summonses Part 2, #18 Exhibit 11 Certificates of Service, #19 Exhibit Air Liquid Systems Motion to Dismiss, #20 Exhibit Akzo Nobel Motion to Dismiss Motion to Transfer Venue, #21 Exhibit Akzo Nobel Motion to Dismiss Personal Jurisdiction, #22 Exhibit Aurora Pump Motion to Dismiss Petition, #23 Exhibit Autozone Motion to Dismiss Petition, #24 Exhibit Bridgestone America Motion to Dismiss Petition, #25 Exhibit Bridgestone Tire Motion to Dismiss Petititon, #26 Exhibit BWIP Motion to Dismiss Collateral Estoppel, #27 Exhibit Carlisle Motion to Dismiss PJ, #28 Exhibit Carrier Corp Motion to Dismiss PJ, #29 Exhibit Caterpillar Crane Georgia Pacific Ingersoll Motion to Dismiss, #30 Exhibit Certainteed Motion to Dismiss, #31 Exhibit Continental Auto Motion to Dismiss PJ, #32 Exhibit Conwed Corp Motion to Dismiss PJ, #33 Exhibit Daimler Trucks Motion for Leave, #34 Exhibit Daimler Trucks Motion to Dimiss, #35 Exhibit Dow Chemical Motion to Dismiss Petition, #36 Exhibit Eaton Corp Motion to Dismiss PJ, #37 Exhibit Federal Mogul Motion to Dismiss PJ, #38 Exhibit Federal Mogul Motion to Dismiss 2, #39 Exhibit Ford Motor Motion to Dismiss, #40 Exhibit Ford Motor Motion to Transfer Venue, #41 Exhibit Ford Motor Motion to Inspect and Copy Plaintiff Medical Records, #42 Exhibit FWEC Motion to Dismiss PJ, #43 Exhibit GE Motion to Dismiss PJ, #44 Exhibit Goodyear Motion to Dismiss PJ, #45 Exhibit Grinnell Motion to Dismiss, #46 Exhibit Honeywell Motion to Dismiss Conspiracy Count, #47 Exhibit Illinois Tool Works Motion to Dismiss PJ, #48 Exhibit Ingersoll Motion for PHV, #49 Exhibit ITT Motion to dismiss, #50 Exhibit JR Clarkson Motion to Dismiss, #51 Exhibit Kelly Moore Paint Motion to Dismiss PJ, #52 Exhibit Lufkin Motion to Dismiss, #53 Exhibit Mack Trucks Motion to Dismiss PJ, #54 Exhibit Maremont Motion to Dismiss, #55 Exhibit Paccar Motion to Dismiss, #56 Exhibit Paccar Motion to Transfer Venue, #57 Exhibit Plaintiff Motion to Appoint SPS, #58 Exhibit Pneumo Abex Motion to Dismiss, #59 Exhibit Riley Stoker Motion for PHV, #60 Exhibit Riley Stoker Motion to Dismiss, #61 Exhibit Riley Stoker MSJ, #62 Exhibit Sprinkmann Motion to Dismiss PJ, #63 Exhibit Taco Inc Motion to Dismiss, #64 Exhibit Union Carbide Motion to Dismiss, #65 Exhibit Warren Pump Motion for PHV, #66 Exhibit Warren Pump Motion to Dismiss, #67 Exhibit Weil Mclain Motion to Dismiss PJ, #68 Exhibit Western Auto Motion to Dismiss, #69 Exhibit Western Auto Motion to Transfer Venue, #70 Exhibit Whitney Automotive Motion to Dismiss PJ, #71 Exhibit Young Group Motion to Dismiss, #72 Exhibit Young Insulation Motion to Dismiss, #73 Exhibit Order Grant Daimler Trucks Motion for Leave, #74 Exhibit Order Grant Ingersoll PHV motion 2, #75 Exhibit Order Grant Ingersoll PHV motion, #76 Exhibit Order Grant Plaintiff Motion to Change Motion Judge, #77 Exhibit Order Grant Plaintiff Motion for SPS, #78 Exhibit Order Grant Plaintiff PHV motion, #79 Exhibit Order Grant Riley Stoker PHV Motion, #80 Exhibit Order Reassigning case to Division 31 for pre-trial matters, #81 Exhibit Order Grant Dismissal Without Prejudice of Viking Pump Inc)(Wilson, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacCormack et al v. The Adel Wiggins Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Represented By: E. Ben Thames
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Represented By: Gregory D. Debeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Michael F. Daniels
Represented By: Patrick D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey Hayes Co.
Represented By: Edward S. Bott, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon R. Summers
Represented By: Andrew M. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Woodard
Represented By: Jon A. Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Clarkson Company
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Scott R. Hunsaker
Represented By: Alex A. Belotserkovsky
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Automotive Group Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie M. Galetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita Maria Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Control Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Philip M. Eisele
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Wiggins Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Gasket Corporation
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Represented By: Agota Peterfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain-Teed Corporation
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-Mclain Company
Represented By: James Russell Williams
Represented By: Ashley E. Benoist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Represented By: Andrew M. Voss
Represented By: David W. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fruehauf Corporation
Represented By: Edward S. Bott, Jr.
Represented By: Shannon R. Summers
Represented By: Andrew M. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B. Beshore
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Represented By: Agota Peterfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell, LLC
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita Maria Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia M. Giokaris
Represented By: Nathan Asher Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Matthew E. Pelikan
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Represented By: Thomas L. Orris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Barkley
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Scott R. Hunsaker
Represented By: Alex A. Belotserkovsky
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Alex A. Belotserkovsky
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Robert Drake Andrekanic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company, The
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Represented By: Paul B. Lee
Represented By: Leo W. Nelsen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Maassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Paul W. Lore
Represented By: Marcie J. Vantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motor Company
Represented By: E. Ben Thames
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Represented By: Gregory D. Debeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Represented By: Beth Kamp Veath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Co Inc.
Represented By: James Russell Williams
Represented By: Ashley E. Benoist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Company
Represented By: E. Ben Thames
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Represented By: Gregory D. Debeer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Melanie E. Riley
Represented By: Michael P. McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Bushnell Packing Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Michael Sinars
Represented By: Patrick M. Grand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Commerical Boilers
Represented By: Trevor Alan Sondag
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Represented By: Agota Peterfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Albert J. Bronsky
Represented By: Agota Peterfy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draco Mechanical Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: James Russell Williams
Represented By: Ashley E. Benoist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor Alan Sondag
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Georgiann Oliver
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks Inc
Represented By: Robert Drake Andrekanic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Moore Paint Company
Represented By: William C. Foote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Sugar and Refining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Pagan
Represented By: Lizabeth M. Conran
Represented By: Shannon R. Summers
Represented By: Andrew M. Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Teves, Inc..
Represented By: James Russell Williams
Represented By: Richard William Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Neal B. Griffin
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Woodard
Represented By: Jon A. Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Trailer Manufacturing Company
Represented By: William C. Foote
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conwed Corporation
Represented By: Trevor Alan Sondag
Represented By: Dennis J. Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprinkmann Sons Corporation
Represented By: Robert Drake Andrekanic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Ryan Riegerix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Represented By: Justin S. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Boiler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Alex A. Belotserkovsky
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primerica Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Tool Works, Inc.
Represented By: James Russell Williams
Represented By: Ashley E. Benoist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lufkin Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin Tucker Blaser
Represented By: John P. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Group Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Woodard
Represented By: Jon A. Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: April A. Vesely
Represented By: Marcie J. Vantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa Auto Parts
Represented By: Michael F. Daniels
Represented By: Patrick D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia M. Giokaris
Represented By: Nathan Asher Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Valves
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: J. Todd Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Bigham
Represented By: Matthew R. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc. formerly known as Akzo Nobel Paints, LLC doing business as The Glidden Company
Represented By: Steven B. Beshore
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler-Hammer
Represented By: J. Todd Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Scott R. Hunsaker
Represented By: Alex A. Belotserkovsky
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Tayyab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Can Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akzo Nobel Paints, LLC
Represented By: Steven B. Beshore
Represented By: Robert Jacob Hurtt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacome, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Donahue
Represented By: Michael R. Dauphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Valves, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, a division of Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Jackson Pump Division
Represented By: James Russell Williams
Represented By: Ashley E. Benoist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Stoker Corporation
Represented By: Kent L. Plotner
Represented By: Philip M. Eisele
Represented By: Gregory C. Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Sales Corp.
Represented By: Benjamin Daniel Woodard
Represented By: Jon A. Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Whitney & Co.
Represented By: Stephanie M. Galetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Loftus
Represented By: Sean Patrick Barth
Represented By: Timothy Paul Hulla, Sr
Represented By: Demetrious T. Zacharopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berj Hovsepian
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Represented By: Laci M. Whitley
Represented By: Timothy Paul Hulla, Sr
Represented By: Erin Rafferty Hergenrother
Represented By: Luke Perry Pfeifer
Represented By: Carson C. Menges
Represented By: Demetrious T. Zacharopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Broudy
Represented By: Sean Patrick Barth
Represented By: Timothy Paul Hulla, Sr
Represented By: Demetrious T. Zacharopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane MacCormack
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Represented By: Sean Patrick Barth
Represented By: Timothy Paul Hulla, Sr
Represented By: Demetrious T. Zacharopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Benjamin John Wilson
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?