Communications Unlimited Contracting Services, Inc. et al v. Broadband Infrastructure Connection, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Communications Unlimited Contracting Services, Inc., Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company and St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Broadband Infrastructure Connection, LLC and Mid-Continent Casualty Company |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00516 |
Filed: |
April 13, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Within US but Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
Shirley Padmore Mensah |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 10, 2021 |
Filing
313
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Mid-Continents motion to alter or amend the judgment is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/10/21. (KJS)
|
September 1, 2021 |
Filing
304
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/1/2021. (JMP)
|
April 4, 2019 |
Filing
196
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/4/2019. (AFC)
|
October 12, 2018 |
Filing
144
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties respective motions for summary judgment are DENIED. ECF Nos. 102 , 104 , 106 , 110 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/12/2018. (KCB)
|
March 12, 2018 |
Filing
85
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Plaintiff Communications Unlimited Contracting Services for partial summary judgment on Defendant Mid-Continent Casualty Company's Counterclaim for indemnity or contribution is GRANTED. (EFC No. 48 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 12, 2018. (BRP)
|
September 1, 2017 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (ECF. No. 55 ) of Defendant Broadband Infrastructure Connection, LLC, to compel discovery is GRANTED with respect to its Production Requests Nos. 1 and 3. Communications Unlimited shall p roduce the documents within seven days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Communications Unlimited maintains that it does not have the documents at issue in Request No. 3, Communications Unlimited shall, within seven days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, submit proof to the Court of efforts taken to locate the documents, and if they no longer exist, to explain to the Court what happened to them and why. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion (ECF No. 67 ) Defendant Broadband Infrastructure Connection, LLC, for a ruling on the above motion is DENIED as moot.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/1/2017. (NEB)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion (ECF 38 ) of Plaintiff Communications Unlimited to dismiss Mid-Continents counterclaim for indemnification is converted to a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civi l Procedure 12(d). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Communications Unlimited shall have up to and including June 10, 2017, to supplement its memorandum in support of the motion at issue and to submit any additional pertinent materials. Mid-Continent sh all have 28 days after the filing of the supplemental memorandum to respond to Communication Unlimiteds motion for summary judgment on Mid-Continents counterclaim for indemnification. Communications Unlimited shall have 14 days thereafter to file a reply.. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 05/10/2017. (KCB)
|
October 26, 2016 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 15 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by Defendant Broadband Infrastructure Connection, LLC. Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/26/16. (CAR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?