In re: Reed
Debtor: Evette Nicole Reed
Appellant: Critique Services, LLC, Beverly Holmes-Diltz and Ross Harry Briggs
Trustee: Seth A. Albin
Case Number: 4:2016cv00633
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Rehearing of Appellant Ross H. Briggs. (ECF No. 59 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on February 5, 2017. (BRP)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeals of Ross H. Briggs and Critique Services, LLC of the Bankruptcy Court's decision are DENIED. The April 20, 2016 Orders of the Bankruptcy Court are affirmed. An appropriate Judgment is filed herewith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 3, 3017. (BRP)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Appellant Critique Services, LLC for Stay of Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal (ECF No. 12 ) and the Motion of Appellant Ross H. Briggs for a Stay of Judgment of the Ba nkruptcy Court Pending Appeal (ECF No. 14 ) are DENIED. The April 20, 2016 Orders of the Bankruptcy Court remain in effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion of Appellant Ross H. Briggs for an Expedited Hearing of Appellant's Motion for Stay of Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal (ECF 17 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/15/2016. (NEB)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that parties Bankruptcy Judge Charles E. Rendlen, III and the United States Bankruptcy Court shall file their response to the Motion of Appellant Critique Services, LLC for a Stay of Judgment of the Bankr uptcy Court Pending Appeal (ECF No. 12 ) and the Motion of Appellant Ross H. Briggs for a Stay for Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal (ECF No. 14 ) no later than June 21, 2016. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 7, 2016. (BRP)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Attorney's Office shall represent the United States Bankruptcy Court and the Honorable Charles E. Rendlen, III in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Attor ney's Office shall file a response to the Motion of Appellant Ross H. Briggs for an Expedited Hearing of Appellant's Motion for Stay of Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court Pending Appeal (ECF No. 17 ) no later than June 7, 2016. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 1, 2016. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Evette Nicole Reed
Represented By: Ross H. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Critique Services, LLC
Represented By: Laurence D. Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Beverly Holmes-Diltz
Represented By: Laurence D. Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ross Harry Briggs
Represented By: Jerome J. Dobson
Represented By: Susan Nell Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Seth A. Albin
Represented By: Seth A. Albin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?