O' Bryant v. World Management Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth O' Bryant
Defendant: World Management Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv00836
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Noelle C. Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet along with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cause service of process to be effected upon the Defendant no later than September 22, 2017. Failure to properly serve Defendant or otherwise move this Court to direct the U.S. Marshal to serve process by this date may result in the dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on July 18, 2017. (BRP)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than April 21, 2017, Plaintiff shall submit a fully-completed Form CJA 23 (Financial Affidavit). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts Form CJA 23 (Financial Affidavit). (A copy of this order and the CJA23 mailed to plaintiff.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 04/11/2017. (KCB)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 11 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 12/08/2016. (KCB)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Kenneth O'Bryant's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Docket No. 2 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall cause service of process to be effected upon the defendant no later than Thursday, January 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on October 21, 2016. (BRP)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall either pay the statutory filing fee or submit a fully-completed CJA Form 23 (financial affidavit). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice and without further notice to him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 09/13/2016. (KCB)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff shall either pay the statutory filing fee or submit a fully-completed CJA Form 23 (financial affidavit). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this case without prejudice and without further notice to him. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/8/16. (KXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O' Bryant v. World Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth O' Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?