Whittaker v. USA

Petitioner: Mijkia Carl Whittaker
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2016cv00972
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the government is granted leave to file its objection to the presentence investigation report out of time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government's motion to stay a ruling on movant's § 2255 motion for post-conviction relief is DENIED. [Doc. 20]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Memorandum and Order in movant's criminal case file, United States v. Whitt aker, 4:04-CR-26 CAS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall file its response to movant's § 2255 motion by August 17, 2017. ( Response to Court due by 8/17/2017.). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/10/2017. (MRC)
May 12, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall notify the United States Probation Office of movant's § 2255 motion to vacate and that it is brought pursuant to theSupreme Court case of Johnson v. Uni ted States,135 S.Ct. 2551 (2015). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within a reasonable time, and in its usual course of business, the United States Probation Office shall prepare and file in movant's criminal case a new Resentence Report relative to movant's contentions under Johnson, which shall be filed under seal, with access to the Court and the parties who have entered their appearance in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the fil ing of the Probation Office's Disclosure Copy of the Resentence Report, the parties shall file, in movant's criminal case, simultaneous objections to the Resentence Report or statements that they have no objection. Within seven (7) days of such time, the United States Probation Office shall file a final copy of the Resentence Report in movant's criminal case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the Final Resentence Report by the Probat ion Office in the criminal case, the Government shall file its response to movant's motion to vacate in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any reply to the Government's response to the motion to vacate shall be filed, in this case, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date the response is filed. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 5/12/2017. (MRC)
July 18, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's motion to stay this action [Doc. #2] is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's amended motion to vacate is due to this Court no later than forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. ( Response to Court due by 9/2/2016.). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 7/18/2016. (MRC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?