Adams v. USA
Petitioner: |
Curtis Adams |
Respondent: |
USA |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv01061 |
Filed: |
June 27, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Catherine D. Perry |
Nature of Suit: |
Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 17, 2019 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Curtis Adams motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 1 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Adams motion to supplement his § 2255 motion 26 is granted, b ut the additional claims raised therein are denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court will not issue a certificate of appealability, as Adams has not made a substantial showing that he has been denied a federal constitutional right. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 09/17/2019. (KCB)
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant's motion for evidentiary hearing [Doc. #9] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on September 8, 2016. (MCB)
|
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of movant's § 2255 motion to the Office of the Public Defender for the Southern District of Illinois. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk s hould enter Federal Public Defender Phillip J. Kavanaugh as counsel for movant in this action so that the Office of the Federal Public Defender in the Southern District of Illinois shall receive notice of all filings in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that the Public Defender shall notify this Court, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, whether it will be pursuing movant's arguments under Johnson, either by filing a written notice in this action of thei r intent not to represent movant, or by filing an amended motion to vacate, brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, also in this action, or a request in the Court of Appeals for leave to bring a successive § 2255 motion, as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall hold this matter in abeyance for fortyfive (45) days. ( Response to Court due by 8/20/2016.), Attorney Phillip Kavanaugh for Curtis Adams added. Attorney St. Louis Fed Public Defender terminated. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on July 6, 2016. (Copy of Memorandum and Order sent to:Curtis Adams, 35592-044,TERRE HAUTE - USP, P.O. BOX 33,Terre Haute, IN 47808 this date.)(MCB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?