Carter v. USA
Petitioner: Juanell Carter
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2016cv01071
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movants motion to stay this action [Doc. # 10 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall respond to the Court within thirty (30) days of this Order as to how movant wishes to proceed in this action given the outcome of the Supreme Court case of Beckles v. United States, 137 S.Ct. 886 (2017).( Response to Court due by 5/5/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/5/17. (KJS)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movants request to stay this action pending the United States Supreme Courts decision in Beckles v. United States, -- U.S.--, 136 S.Ct. 2510, No. 15-8544, 2016 WL 1029080 (cert. granted June 27, 2016) [Doc. # 8 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant must give notice to the Court within twenty- eight (28) days of the Supreme Courts decision. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/2/17. (KJS)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Public Defender must notify the Court no later than Wednesday, September 21, 2016, whether it intends to represent movant on this matter. Response to Court due by 9/21/2016. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/6/16. (CLA)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of movant's § 2255 motion to the Office of the Public Defender for the Eastern District of Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Public D efender shall notify this Court, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, whether it will be pursuing movant's arguments under Johnson, either by filing a written notice in this action of their intent not to represen t movant, or by filing an amended motion to vacate, brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, also in this action, or a request in the Court of Appeals for leave to bring a successive § 2255 motion, as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall hold this matter in abeyance for forty-five (45) days. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/11/2016. (Response to Court due by 8/25/2016.) (Cc: FPD)(GGB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?