August 13, 2019 |
Filing
111
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth in this Order. ECF No. 106. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before August 16, 2019, Plaintiff shall advise co unsel for Defendants whether he wishes to take any supplemental depositions. Defendants shall make a good faith effort to produce any witnesses for a supplemental deposition within three (3) weeks thereof, or as may be agreed by counsel, at Defendants' cost. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 13, 2019. (MCB)
|
May 29, 2019 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Corizon Defendants' second motion for protective order is GRANTED. ECF No. 97 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/29/2019. (AFC)
|
May 8, 2019 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before May 22, 2019, the Corizon Defendants will supplement their discovery responses and provide documents in compliance with this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the quality of the medical records and solutions thereof on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/8/2019. (AFC)
|
July 19, 2018 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Corizon, LLC., Reynal Caldwell, M.D., Brenda Mallard, M.D., Fe Fuentes, M.D., Beverly Hatcher, Roschell Norton, Richard White, Angie Wyatt, LaCinda Jones, and Danyelle Sullivans motion to dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's second amended complaint is GRANTED( ECF No. 72 ). Count IV of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/19/2018. (AFC)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Lawrence Drummer Jr.'s motion for more definite statement and motion to strike the Corizon Defendants' affirmative defenses is DENIED. ECF No. 66 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 14, 2018. (BRP)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appointment of Richard Magee and the Magee Law Firm, LLC, as counsel for Plaintiff [ECF No. 34 ] is TERMINATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to appoint new counsel to repres ent Plaintiff, pursuant to the Plan for the Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. A separate Notice of Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel must be entered by the Clerk. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that in light of the Courts Order appointing new counsel to repre sent Plaintiff, Defendants Motion for Entry of Case Management Order or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute [ECF No. 35 ] is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 07/12/2017. (A copy of this Memorandum and Order mailed to Plaintiff and emailed to K. Spurgeon for appointment of new counsel.) (KCB)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions to appoint counsel [ECF Nos. 3 , 9 ] are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that John P. Rahoy, BROWN AND JAMES, P.C., 800 Market Street, Suite 1100, St. Louis, Mo 63101, Phone: (314) 242-5336, Fax: (314) 242-5536, is appointed to represent Plaintiff in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide Plaintiff's newly-appointed counsel with a complete copy of the court file at no cost. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 17, 2016. (BRP)
|
November 10, 2016 |
Filing
22
VACATED -MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions to appoint counsel [ECF Nos. 3 , 9 ] are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that John Selden Martin, LEWIS RICE, LLC, 600 Washington St., Suite 2500, St. Louis, Mo 63101, Phone: 314-444-7600 x361, Fax: 314-612- 1361, is appointed to represent Plaintiff in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide Plaintiffs newly-appointed counsel with a complete copy of the court file at no cost. (attorney John Selden Martin for Lawrence Drummer, Jr added). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/10/2016. (NEB) Modified on 11/10/2016 (NEB).
|
September 8, 2016 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 7 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $17 within thirty (30) days of the date o f this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance i s for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to issue process on defendants Reynal Caldwell and M. Mallard in accordance with the Court's agreement with Corizon, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Corizon Correctional Health Care is DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/8/16. (KXS)
|