Meier v. St. Louis, Missouri, City of et al
Plaintiff: |
Mary R Meier |
Defendant: |
St. Louis, Missouri, City of, Doc's Towing, Inc., Richard H. Gray, Thomas Irwin, Erwin Switzer, Bettye Battle-Turner, Francis G. Slay, St. Louis Board of Police Commissioners and St. Louis P.O. House |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv01549 |
Filed: |
September 30, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Rodney W. Sippel |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 6, 2022 |
Filing
234
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment, Doc. 195 , is GRANTED in part. An Amended Judgment will be entered consistent with this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 05/06/2022. (KCD)
|
November 13, 2019 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: As discussed with counsel during today's status conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be referred to alternative dispute resolution on January 31, 2020, and that reference shall terminate on March 31, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is set for a JURY trial on April 20, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 16-South. This is a two week docket. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/13/19. (KEK)
|
October 23, 2019 |
Filing
105
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for relief from judgment 99 is denied, and the motion for oral argument 100 is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/23/19. (ARL)
|
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to depose 51 is granted, and Farmington Correctional Center, 1012 West Columbia Street, Farmington, Missouri 63640, is ordered to make Benjamin Meier available for a full contact depositi on at FCC on November 29, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. in a room that will accommodate all attorneys of record and a certified court report. If defendant requires an additional order from the Court to effectuate the deposition, it is defendants responsibility to provide a proposed Order to the Court in Word format, and defendant should contact the Clerks Office for further instructions if required. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/14/17. (ARL)
|
November 7, 2017 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that only that portion of the amended case management order 53 which grants the motion to depose is vacated, and the remainder of the amended case management order remains in full force and effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to depose 51 remains pending and will be denied on November 13, 2017, unless defendant files a memorandum in support of the motion as set out above.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/7/17. (LGK)
|
October 25, 2017 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for extensions of time 43 is denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/25/2017. (CAR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?