Bristol v Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Nola H. Bristol and Gene B. Bristol
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC, Ford Motor Company, Arvinmeritor, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc., BWDAC, Inc., Continental Teves, Inc., Dana Companies, LLC, Eaton Corporation, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Genuine Parts Company, Genuine Parts Distributors, Georgia Pacific, LLC, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Kelsey-Hayes Company, Luk Clutch Systems, LLC, Maremont Corporation, Mendenhall Motor Company doing business as Mendenhall Rebuilders, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, American Brake Shoe Company, American brake Shoe and Foundry Compnay including the American Brakeblok Division, successor-by-merger to the American Brake Shoe and Foundry COmany and the American Brakeblok Corporation, The American Brake Materials Corporation, Standard Motor Products, Inc., Tracy Industries Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Alma Products Company, Fred Jones Enterprises, LLC and Hesco Parts Corporation
Case Number: 4:2016cv01649
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/27/2016. (CLO) (cc: St. Louis City Circuit Clerk)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to remand is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks remand of this action to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. The motion is denied to the extent it seeks an award of costs, fees, expenses, and sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail to the clerk of the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis a certified copy of this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that all other motions pending in this Court are DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/27/2016. (CLO)(cc: St. Louis City Circuit Clerk)
October 26, 2016 Filing 54 AMENDED SURREPLY to Motion re #37 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, State of Missouri (Amended for Footnote 1) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harden, Ty) Modified on 10/27/2016 (CLO).
October 26, 2016 Filing 53 SURREPLY to Motion re #37 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, State of Missouri filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harden, Ty)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: It is HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Ford Motor Company must file any sur-reply to Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion to remand no later than October 26, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/26/2016. (CLO)
October 26, 2016 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, State of Missouri filed by Plaintiff Nola H. Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Ex 7, #8 Exhibit Ex 8, #9 Exhibit Ex 9)(Besserman, Dawn)
October 25, 2016 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, State of Missouri filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Harden, Ty)
October 25, 2016 Filing 49 Letter to attorney Ben K. Upp from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
October 25, 2016 Filing 48 Letter to attorney Sherry Rozell from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
October 25, 2016 Filing 47 Letter to attorney Vincent Gunter from Deputy Clerk re: admission Pro Hac Vice (JWD)
October 25, 2016 Filing 46 Letter to attorney Lillian Talbot from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the Eastern District of MO (JWD)
October 25, 2016 Filing 45 Letter to attorney Nathaniel Mudd from Deputy Clerk Re:admission to the Eastern District of MO (JWD)
October 25, 2016 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
October 24, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Newly Disclosed Fact Witnesses Included in Her Deposition Designations by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Clerk's note: the attachment has been sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains the addresses of persons who are not a party in the case.(JWD)
October 24, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION for Setoff and to Compel Plaintiff to Disclose the Existence of Settlements or Recoveries Anticipated or Received from Other Parties, Non-Parties, or Trusts by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F)(JWD)
October 24, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to Compel Ford's Suspension Orders and Related Documents by Plaintiff Nola H. Bristol. (JWD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2016: #1 Exhibits A-F) (JWD).
October 24, 2016 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff Nola H. Bristol. (JWD)
October 24, 2016 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JWD)
October 24, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (JWD)
October 24, 2016 Filing 38 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Defendant Dana Companies, LLC. (JWD)
October 24, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, State of Missouri by Plaintiff Nola H. Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Besserman, Dawn)
October 24, 2016 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to 22nd Judicial Circuit Court, State of Missouri by Plaintiff Nola H. Bristol. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Ex 7, #8 Exhibit Ex 8, #9 Exhibit Ex 9, #10 Exhibit Ex 10, #11 Exhibit Ex 11, #12 Exhibit Ex 12, #13 Exhibit Ex 13, #14 Exhibit Ex 14, #15 Exhibit Ex 15, #16 Exhibit Ex 16, #17 Exhibit Ex 17, #18 Exhibit Ex 18, #19 Exhibit Ex 19)(Besserman, Dawn) Modified on 10/25/2016 to correct event used (JWD).
October 24, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal Petition,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-40, #2 Exhibit A-41, #3 Exhibit A-42, #4 Exhibit A-43, #5 Exhibit A-44, #6 Exhibit A-45, #7 Exhibit A-46, #8 Exhibit A-47, #9 Exhibit A-48, #10 Exhibit A-49, #11 Exhibit A-50, #12 Exhibit A-51, #13 Exhibit A-52, #14 Exhibit A-53, #15 Exhibit A-54, #16 Exhibit A-55, #17 Exhibit A-56, #18 Exhibit A-57, #19 Exhibit A-58, #20 Exhibit A-59, #21 Exhibit A-60, #22 Exhibit A-61, #23 Exhibit A-62, #24 Exhibit A-63, #25 Exhibit A-64, #26 Exhibit A-65, #27 Exhibit A-66, #28 Exhibit A-67, #29 Exhibit A-68, #30 Exhibit A-69, #31 Exhibit A-70, #32 Exhibit A-71, #33 Exhibit A-72, #34 Exhibit A-73, #35 Exhibit A-74, #36 Exhibit A-75, #37 Exhibit A-76, #38 Exhibit A-77, #39 Exhibit A-78, #40 Exhibit A-79, #41 Exhibit A-80, #42 Exhibit A-81, #43 Exhibit A-82, #44 Exhibit A-83, #45 Exhibit A-84, #46 Exhibit A-85, #47 Exhibit A-86)(Harden, Ty) Modified on 10/25/2016 to correct event used (JWD).
October 24, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Defendant Luk Clutch Systems, LLC. (BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 33 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Defendant Georgia Pacific, LLC. (BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 32 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Defendant Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust. (BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 31 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 30 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Standard Motor Products, Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 29 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Eaton Corporation.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 28 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Genuine Parts Company.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 27 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Hennessy Industries, Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 26 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Honeywell International Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 25 Second Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Nola H. Bristol.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 24 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Kelsey-Hayes Company.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition,,,,,, by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Harden, Ty)
October 24, 2016 Filing 22 ANSWER to First Amneded Complaint by Standard Motor Products, Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 21 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 20 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Eaton Corporation.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Honeywell International Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 18 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Genuine Parts Company.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 17 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Hennessy Industries, Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 16 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Nola H. Bristol, Gene B. Bristol.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell International Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Kelsey-Hayes Company.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Eaton Corporation.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Standard Motor Products, Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ty Zackery Harden for Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Harden, Ty)
October 24, 2016 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Hennessy Industries, Inc..(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Genuine Parts Company.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Nola H. Bristol, Gene B. Bristol.(BAK)
October 24, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Plaintiff Ford Motor Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Rozell, Sherry)
October 24, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Plaintiff Ford Motor Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rozell, Sherry)
October 24, 2016 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Ford Motor Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: See attached Exhibit A, Publicly held company: See attached Exhibit A,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rozell, Sherry)
October 24, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 1522-cc10413, with receipt number 0865-5644115, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8a, #9 Exhibit A-8b, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11, #13 Exhibit A-12a, #14 Exhibit A-12b, #15 Exhibit A-13, #16 Exhibit A-14, #17 Exhibit A-15, #18 Exhibit A-16a, #19 Exhibit A-16b, #20 Exhibit A-17a, #21 Exhibit A-17b, #22 Exhibit A-18, #23 Exhibit A-19, #24 Exhibit A-20a, #25 Exhibit A-20b, #26 Exhibit A-21a, #27 Exhibit A-21b, #28 Exhibit A-22a, #29 Exhibit A-22b, #30 Exhibit A-23a, #31 Exhibit A-23b, #32 Exhibit A-24a, #33 Exhibit A-24b, #34 Exhibit A-25a, #35 Exhibit A-25b, #36 Exhibit A-26a, #37 Exhibit A-26b, #38 Exhibit A-27, #39 Exhibit A-28, #40 Exhibit A-29, #41 Exhibit A-30a, #42 Exhibit A-30b, #43 Exhibit A-31a, #44 Exhibit A-31b, #45 Exhibit A-32, #46 Exhibit A-33, #47 Exhibit A-34a, #48 Exhibit A-34b, #49 Exhibit A-35, #50 Exhibit A-36a, #51 Exhibit A-36b, #52 Exhibit A-36c, #53 Exhibit A-36d, #54 Exhibit A-37, #55 Exhibit A-38, #56 Exhibit A-39, #57 Exhibit B, #58 Exhibit C, #59 Exhibit D, #60 Exhibit E, #61 Exhibit F-1, #62 Exhibit F-2, #63 Civil Cover Sheet, #64 Original Filing Form)(Rozell, Sherry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol v Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Ben K. Upp
Represented By: Sherry A. Rozell
Represented By: Ty Zackery Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Russell K. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWDAC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Teves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Lindsay A. Dibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Patrick D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Nickelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent Edward Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Represented By: Edward S. Bott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luk Clutch Systems, LLC
Represented By: Roger K. Heidenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendenhall Motor Company doing business as Mendenhall Rebuilders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Control Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Dale M. Weppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brake Shoe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American brake Shoe and Foundry Compnay including the American Brakeblok Division, successor-by-merger to the American Brake Shoe and Foundry COmany and the American Brakeblok Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Brake Materials Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M. Weppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Jones Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hesco Parts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nola H. Bristol
Represented By: Dawn M. Besserman
Represented By: Lillian Talbot
Represented By: Nathaniel D. Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene B. Bristol
Represented By: Nathaniel D. Mudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?