Shahid v. U.S. Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Sharhonda T. Shahid |
Defendant: |
Kathryn East, Unknown Police Dispatcher, Unknown Jailer, Jarrod Coder, Christopher Easton, Unknown Prosecuting Attorney and Florissant Missouri, city of |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv01662 |
Filed: |
October 25, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Catherine D. Perry |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
62
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum and Order to Show Cause issued to plaintiff on September 6, 2017 60 , and plaintiff's response to the Order to Show Cause 61 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendant East are dismissed with prejudice, and paragraph 30 is stricken from plaintiff's complaint 7 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause is deemed satisfied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant East's motion to dismiss 33 is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/20/2017. (CBL)
|
September 6, 2017 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than September 18, 2017, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why the Court should not enter sanctions, which may include monetary fines and/or the dismissal of some or al l of plaintiff's claims against defendant East, against her and/or her attorney for violating Rule 11(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by pleading that defendant East called the police and "advised [defendant police officers] t hat Plaintiff was armed or otherwise engaged in the commission of a felony offense," despite being in possession of the 911 and dispatch recordings which refute this allegation. No extensions of time will be granted. However, if plaintiff move s for a dismissal with prejudice of her claims against defendant East and to strike this allegation from the complaint by September 18, 2017, she need not comply with this Memorandum and Order to Show Cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the February 9, 2017 Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution 24 is vacated, and this case is no longer referred to mediation. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/6/2017. (CBL)
|
August 18, 2017 |
Filing
57
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than August 23, 2017, plaintiff shall deliver to my chambers a copy of the 911 and dispatch recordings described above. If a written transcript of the recordings is available, it shall also be provided to the Court by the same date. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/18/17. (JAB)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motions for summary judgment [ 29 , 35 ] are denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 7/10/2017. (CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?