Baker et al v. City of Florissant
Plaintiff: |
Thomas Baker, Sean Bailey, Nicole Bolden, Allison Nelson and Meredith Walker |
Defendant: |
City of Florissant |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv01693 |
Filed: |
October 31, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette A. Baker |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1981 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 2, 2024 |
Filing
289
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court on February 1, 2023, certified three Rule 23(b)(3) and Rule 23(b)(2) classes. (ECF No. 253.) The Court also appointed Nathaniel Carroll,1 John Waldron, and Blake Strode of Arch City Defenders, Inc.; Andrea R. Gold of Tycko & Zavareei LLP; and Ryan Keane of Keane Law LLC as Class Counsel for the certified classes. (Id.) 2. Pursuant to Ru le 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court hereby certifies that this action may proceed as a class action, for settlement purposes only, on behalf of an additional Rule 23(b)(3) class, the Remaining Paid Fines Class, defined as: (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) ( Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2024 01:00 PM in Courtroom 13N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 1/2/2024. (CLH)
|
February 1, 2023 |
Filing
254
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See full Order for Complete Details). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant City of Florissant's Motion to Disqualify and Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. William Rogers and John Ward Economics (ECF No. 194 ) is DENI ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Thomas R. Ireland (ECF No. 164 ) is DENIED to the extent plaintiffs seek to exclude Dr. Irelands report and testimony in toto, but GRANTED consistent with the limitations set out in this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 2/1/23. (EAB)
|
February 25, 2021 |
Filing
201
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. [Doc. 142.] The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend their Complaint to correct de mographical information of the Plaintiffs, including age, incarceration periods, fine amounts, incorrect dates, and any typographical errors. Plaintiffs are also granted leave to remove paragraphs that are no longer supported by the information re vealed in discovery. The Court denies Plaintiffs' request for leave to add proposed plaintiff Demetrice Davis, reconfigure and add class categories, and add a claim under Mo. Rev. Stat. § 544.170. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on February 25, 2021. (MCB)
|
May 6, 2020 |
Filing
159
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. [Doc. 142.] The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend their Complaint to correct demographi cal information of the Plaintiffs, including age, incarceration periods, fine amounts, incorrect dates, and any typographical errors. Plaintiffs are also granted leave to remove paragraphs that are no longer supported by the information revealed i n discovery. The Court denies Plaintiffs request for leave to add Defendant Demetrious Davis, reconfigure and add class categories, and add a claim under Mo. Rev. Stat. § 544.170. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on May 6, 2020. (MCB)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant City of Florissants motion to dismiss, or alternatively to strike or for a more definite statement via repleading is DENIED. (Doc. No. 22 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/11/17. (KJS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?