The Grove Assisted Living, LLC v. City of Frontenac, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: The Grove Assisted Living, LLC
Defendant: City of Frontenac, Missouri, Keith Krieg, Christopher Kehr, Tom O'Brien, Margot Martin, Bud Guest, John T O'Connell, Mike Schoedel, David Bray and Brian Warner
Case Number: 4:2016cv01783
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 29 ], is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count II of the Plaintiffs First Amended Petition is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/22/18. (KJS)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, [Doc No. 3 ], is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Count II of the Plaintiff's Petition is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted 14 d ays from the date of this Opinion to file an Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Amended Count II subsequently survives challenge, the Court will continue to hold Count II in abeyance until resolution of the State determination of Count I. ( Amended Complaint due by 9/15/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/1/17. (KJS)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counts I of the Plaintiff's Petition is remanded to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri. This Court retains jurisdiction over Count II. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff s hall respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss within 14 days from the date of this Opinion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Count II remains after the Court considers the Motion to Dismiss, the Court will hold Count II in abeyance until resolution of the State determination of Count I. ( Response to Court due by 4/20/2017.) (CC: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/6/17. (KJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Grove Assisted Living, LLC v. City of Frontenac, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Grove Assisted Living, LLC
Represented By: Donald Kenneth Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: J. Vincent Keady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Frontenac, Missouri
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Krieg
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kehr
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom O'Brien
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margot Martin
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Guest
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T O'Connell
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Schoedel
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bray
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Warner
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?