Certified Enterprises, Inc. et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Certified Enterprises, Inc., Certified Recycling, Inc. and Fibre Resources Unlimited, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2017cv00202
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Court having been advised by counsel that there is a tentative settlement, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the December 17, 2018 trial setting is vacated and the case is stayed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall file, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, a proposed consent judgment, or a report on the status of the tentative settlement Dismissal Paper(s) due by 1/17/2019.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/17/18. (MRS)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for summary judgment (#69) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to strike (#81) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/7/18. (MRS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for limited purpose of one deposition filed by Defendant United States of America.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States motion to extend the discovery deadline for limited purpose of one deposition (#61) is GRANTED, and the deadline is extended to August 23, 2018. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/1/18. (MRS)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Fibre Resources Unlimited, Inc., Plaintiff Certified Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff Certified Recycling, Inc..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall file a proposed order in accordance with this memorandum no later than February 21, 2018 ( Response to Court due by 2/21/2018.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/14/18. (MRS)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Fibre Resources Unlimited, Inc., Plaintiff Certified Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff Certified Recycling, Inc. motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/13/17. (MRS)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to compel (#25) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, in accordance with this Memorandum. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/23/17. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certified Enterprises, Inc. et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certified Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. Gaglio
Represented By: Daniel B. Hodes
Represented By: Shahzad Ahmed Malik
Represented By: Justin N. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certified Recycling, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. Gaglio
Represented By: Daniel B. Hodes
Represented By: Shahzad Ahmed Malik
Represented By: Justin N. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fibre Resources Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. Gaglio
Represented By: Daniel B. Hodes
Represented By: Shahzad Ahmed Malik
Represented By: Justin N. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?