Hendrickson v. Waller et al
Plaintiff: |
Erinn Hendrickson |
Defendant: |
Ken Waller, Sheriff of Jefferson County, Jefferson County Jail, Kevin Carle, Ron Arnhart, John Doe 1 and John Doe 2 |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv00217 |
Filed: |
January 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Shirley Padmore Mensah |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 26, 2018 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than Monday, April 30, 2018, Ms. Hendrickson must produce the twelve Apportionment Documents submitted for in camera review to Defendants. See Order for full details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/26/18. (Attachment: # 1 Privilege Log) (ARL)
|
July 10, 2017 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave of Court to File Fourth Amended Complaint (Doc. 41) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the claims against Defendants Kevin Carle, Ron Arnhart, William Whitely, Robert Lalk, James O'Connell, and the Jefferson County Sherriff's Office are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall obtain service of process on each defendant named in the Fourth Amended Complaint who has not yet been ser ved, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. After additional defendants have been served, the Court will schedule a second Rule 16 Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Kevin Carle's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs& #039; Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 31) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Jefferson County, Ron Arnhart, and Kevin Carle's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 32) is DENIED as mo ot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Jefferson County Sherriff's Office's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 33) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Jefferson County's Motion to D ismiss Counts III, IV, and V of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 34) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Ron Arnhart's Motion to Make More Definite (Doc. 35) is DENIED as moot.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 7/10/17. (LGK)
|
April 13, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Second Motion for More Definite Statement 18 is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file a Second Amended Complaint that remedies the deficiencies set out in Defendants motion and discussed during the Rule 16 Conference no later than May 2, 2017. Defendant must Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by no later than May 17, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time to Amend the Petition 24 is DENIED, as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 4/13/17. (CAR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?