Israel Sanchez v. Centene Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Israel Sanchez and Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund
Defendant: Centene Corp, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, Centene Corp. and Michael F. Neidorff
Petitioner: Amir Softic, UA Local 13 Pension Fund, Richard P. Wolsfeld, Jr. and Sunil Chand
Case Number: 4:2017cv00806
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Referring Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Docket Text ORDER Re: #106 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lauren M. Cruz. by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/29/2019. (AFC)
October 28, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lauren M. Cruz. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7545316) by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Cruz, Lauren)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Docket Text ORDER RE: #104 STIPULATION - Stipulated Protective Order by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/24/2019. (AFC)
October 23, 2019 Filing 104 STIPULATION - Stipulated Protective Order by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Morrison, Peter)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Docket Text ORDER Re: #101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Blair A. Nicholas by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. AND #102 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm David. R. Stickney by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund; ORDERED GRANTED. Attorney Blair A Nicholas and David R. Stickney terminated. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/22/2019. (AFC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm David. R. Stickney by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Uslaner, Jonathan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Blair A. Nicholas by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Uslaner, Jonathan)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 3. Motion to Join Parties due by 2/3/2020. Discovery Completion due by 7/2/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/2020. ADR Future Reference 12/30/2019. Plaintiff's motion for class certification shall be filed no later than February 3, 2020. Defendant shall file a response no later than 44 days after the motion is filed (and no later than March 18, 2020), and any reply may be filed no later than 33 days thereafter (and no later than April 20, 2020). The parties shall cooperate in good faith to ensure that any partys expert offering testimony relevant to class certification is made available for deposition reasonably in advance of the other partys deadline for filing a response or reply. Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12S - St. Louis before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/23/2021. Motion in Limine due by 4/2/2021. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 16, 2019. (MCB)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Docket Text ORDER Re #98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Zachary M. Faigen by Defendant Centene Corp.. and #97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Winston P. Hsiao by Defendant Centene Corp.. ; ORDERED Motions are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 3, 2019. (MCB)
October 2, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Zachary M. Faigen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7497609) by Defendant Centene Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Faigen, Zachary)
October 2, 2019 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Winston P. Hsiao. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7497591) by Defendant Centene Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hsiao, Winston)
September 27, 2019 Filing 96 ANSWER to #66 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke.(Smith, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Filing 95 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. . (Smith, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 conference scheduled for September 27, 2019, is RESET for October 16, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. (Rule 16 Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/6/19. (EAB)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Docket Text ORDER Re: #92 JOINT STIPULATION and MOTION for an Order Extending Defendants' Time to Answer filed by Defendants Centene Corp.; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 9/27/2019.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/6/19. (EAB)
September 5, 2019 Filing 92 JOINT STIPULATION and MOTION for an Order Extending Defendants' Time to Answer by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 conference scheduled for September 24, 2019, is RESET for September 27, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. (Rule 16 Conference set for 9/27/2019 02:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/5/2019. (AFC)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/17/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/24/2019 01:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 3, 2019. (MCB)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' amended complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ECF No. #71 . Plaintiffs' Class Period will now be limited to the time period of May 24, 2016 to July 25, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling conference will be set by separate Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/30/2019. (AFC)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Docket Text ORDER Re: #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; attorney/firm Brandon Marsh by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 22, 2019. (SAA)
April 19, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Brandon Marsh by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Uslaner, Jonathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE Withdrawal of Counsel: by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund (Stickney, David)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Docket Text ORDER Re: #84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Uslaner by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 13, 2019. (SAA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan D. Uslaner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7086796) by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Uslaner, Jonathan)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Docket Text ORDER Re: #82 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney -- Julia Johnson ;attorney/firm Julia Johnson by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 7, 2019. (SAA)
January 4, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney -- Julia Johnson ;attorney/firm Julia Johnson by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Stickney, David)
March 16, 2018 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT of #80 (Oral Argument) held on 2/22/2018 before Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patti Dunn Wecke, Patti_Dunn_Wecke@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2018. (NEP)
February 22, 2018 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig: Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2018 re #71 MOTION to Dismiss :Consolidated Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 66) filed by Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. Parties present for an Oral Argument. The Court hears argument from parties. Matter taken under submission. (Court Reporter:Patti Dunn Wecke, Patti_Dunn_Wecke@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984) (FTR Gold: No) (KCB)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. #71 ) is set for Thursday, February 22, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. (Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2018 01:30 AM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on January 24, 2018. (BRP)
November 29, 2017 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION to Dismiss :Consolidated Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 66) filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Smith, Christopher)
October 30, 2017 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Dismiss :Consolidated Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 66) filed by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Marsh, Brandon)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that in light of the extended briefing schedule set by Order dated May 16, 2017 (ECF No. #64 ), for a motion to dismiss by Defendants, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's Order (ECF No. #75 ) setting oral argument on Defendants' motion to dismiss, for November 22, 2017, is VACATED. A new date for oral argument will be set upon completion of the briefing on the motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on October 18, 2017. (BRP)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for oral argument on their motion to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint is GRANTED. Oral argument is set for at Wednesday November 22, 2017, at 9:30 am in Courtroom 12S. Each side will be allowed one-half hour to present its argument. The parties are advised that the above date and time may need to be reset, subject to the Court's criminal docket. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/17/17. (KXS)
September 15, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for Hearing re #71 MOTION to Dismiss :Consolidated Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 66) by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Smith, Christopher)
September 15, 2017 Filing 73 DECLARATION filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke re #71 MOTION to Dismiss :Consolidated Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 66), #72 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2015 10K, #2 Exhibit 2 - July 2015 Press Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Mar 24 2016 Press Release, #4 Exhibit 4 - ASC 805, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1Q 10Q, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1Q Earnings Call, #7 Exhibit 7 - Investor Day Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2Q 10-Q, #9 Exhibit 9 - Q2 Earnings Call, #10 Exhibit 10 - Jan 2016 Health Net article, #11 Exhibit 11 - HN May 2016 article, #12 Exhibit 12 - HN June 2016 article, #13 Exhibit 13 - July 2016 8K, #14 Exhibit 14 - stock prices, #15 Exhibit 15 - Jefferies Report, #16 Exhibit 16 - usquehanna Report, #17 Exhibit 17 - Credit Suisse Report, #18 Exhibit 18 - Morgan Stanley Report, #19 Exhibit 19 - 3Q 10Q, #20 Exhibit 20 - May 24 UBS Transcript)(Smith, Christopher)
September 15, 2017 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #71 MOTION to Dismiss :Consolidated Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 66) filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Smith, Christopher)
September 15, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss :Consolidated Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 66) by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Smith, Christopher)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #69 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation, filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 6, 2017. (AGF)
September 5, 2017 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher)
July 28, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing Certification: by Plaintiff Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund re #66 Amended Complaint, (Stickney, David)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Docket Text ORDER Re: #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julia Johnson by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 18, 2017. (SAA)
July 17, 2017 Filing 66 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against defendant Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund.(Stickney, David)
July 17, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Julia Johnson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6053936) by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Johnson, Julia)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Parties' Joint Motion for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule and Continuing the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (ECF No. #63 ) is GRANTED, as follows: [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 16, 2017. (BRP)
May 11, 2017 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flannery, Michael)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/12/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 6/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12S before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 4, 2017. (BRP)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the renewed motion of Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund for appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for appointment of Lead and Liaison counsel for the class is GRANTED. (ECF No. #55 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant the 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(i) and (v), Louisiana Sheriffs Pension & Relief Fund is appointed as Lead Plaintiff in this action; Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP is appointed as Lead Counsel, and Cuneo Gilbert & LaDuca, LLP is appointed as Liaison Counsel, for the class. Should any related actions be filed, the Court will consider any motions for consolidation at that point. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on May 1, 2017. (BRP)
April 11, 2017 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Renewed) (Unopposed) filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Flannery, Michael)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movants other than Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund shall have up to and including April 10, 2017, to file renewed motions for appointment as Lead Plaintiff/Lead Counsel. (Response to Court due by 4/10/2017.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/3/2017. (NEB)
March 30, 2017 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Renewed) filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Conran, Joseph)
March 23, 2017 Filing 57 DECLARATION filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund re #55 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Renewed) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Flannery, Michael)
March 23, 2017 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #55 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Renewed) filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Flannery, Michael)
March 23, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff (Renewed) by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flannery, Michael)
March 23, 2017 Filing 54 Corrected ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Flannery for Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Flannery, Michael) Modified on 3/23/2017 (BRP).
March 23, 2017 Filing 53 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Flannery for Plaintiff Israel Sanchez. (Flannery, Michael)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Docket Text ORDER Re: #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brandon Marsh; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 21, 2017. (SAA)
March 20, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brandon Marsh. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5868122) by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Marsh, Brandon)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Docket Text ORDER Re: #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David R. Stickney by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 16, 2017. (SAA)
March 15, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David R. Stickney. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5859610) by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Stickney, David)
March 14, 2017 Filing 48 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings (NEB)
March 10, 2017 Filing 47 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P. Conran for Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Conran, Joseph)
March 10, 2017 Filing 46 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A. Smith for Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Smith, Christopher)
March 1, 2017 Filing 45 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
March 1, 2017 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
March 1, 2017 Filing 44 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:16-cv-08469. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF MISSOURI #28 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The motions for appointment as lead plaintiffs (Dkt. Nos. #15 , #18 , #23 #27 ) are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to their refiling in the transferee district. (lom)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS #15 #18 #23 #27 #28 UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motions and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matters can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motions, noticed for hearing on February 27, 2017, have been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 13, 2017 Filing 41 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #28 filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, #2 Declaration of Scott Law, #3 Declaration of Steve J. Sell)(Morrison, Peter)
February 6, 2017 Filing 40 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #28 filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Stickney, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ)(Attorney David R Stickney added to party Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund(pty:mov))(Stickney, David)
January 30, 2017 Filing 39 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #27 filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Nicholas, Blair)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE DEFENDANTS' TRANSFER MOTION AND THE LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS HEARD TOGETHER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Have Defendants' Transfer Motion and the Lead Plaintiff Motions Heard Together #29 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on the Lead Plaintiff Motions #15 , #18 , #23 , #27 are hereby CONTINUED to 2/27/2017 at 10:00 AM. The briefing schedule shall remain unchanged, such that Replies shall be filed by 1/30/2017. (gk)
January 23, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE Of Changed Availability Re: Defendants' Ex Parte Application To Have Defendants' Transfer Motion And The Lead Plaintiff Motions Heard Together filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Morrison, Peter)
January 23, 2017 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #27 filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Nicholas, Blair)
January 23, 2017 Filing 35 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #18 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel #15 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #27 Response to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions filed by Movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund. (Myers, Danielle)
January 19, 2017 Filing 34 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE DEFENDANTS TRANSFER MOTION AND THE LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS HEARD TOGETHER AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #29 filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. (Nicholas, Blair)
January 19, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE DEFENDANTS TRANSFER MOTION AND THE LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS HEARD TOGETHER AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #29 filed by Movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund. (Myers, Danielle)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jay B. Kasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff and Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, designating Peter B. Morrison as local counsel #10 . (gk)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Scott D. Musoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff and Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, designating Peter B. Morrison as local counsel #11 . (gk)
January 18, 2017 Filing 30 REPLY Response to Lead Plaintiff Movants' Motions for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Morrison, Peter)
January 18, 2017 Filing 29 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO HAVE DEFENDANTS TRANSFER MOTION AND THE LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS HEARD TOGETHER AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Morrison, #2 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Peter)
January 18, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Missouri Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Peter)
January 13, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blair A. Nicholas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order) (Attorney Blair A Nicholas added to party Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund(pty:mov)) (Nicholas, Blair)
January 13, 2017 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by lead plaintiff movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund, (Myers, Danielle)
January 13, 2017 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Danielle S. Myers in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #23 filed by Movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Myers, Danielle)
January 13, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #23 filed by Movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund. (Myers, Danielle)
January 13, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by lead plaintiff movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Myers, Danielle)
January 13, 2017 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Danielle S Myers counsel for Movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund. Adding Danielle S. Myers as counsel of record for UA Local 13 Pension Fund for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by lead plaintiff movant UA Local 13 Pension Fund. (Attorney Danielle S Myers added to party UA Local 13 Pension Fund(pty:mov))(Myers, Danielle)
January 13, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Richard P. Wolsfeld, Jr., (Prongay, Robert)
January 13, 2017 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Robert V. Prongay In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #18 filed by Movant Richard P. Wolsfeld, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Prongay, Robert)
January 13, 2017 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff #18 filed by Movant Richard P. Wolsfeld, Jr.. (Prongay, Robert)
January 13, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Movant Richard P. Wolsfeld, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Richard P. Wolsfeld, Jr.(pty:mov)) (Prongay, Robert)
January 13, 2017 Filing 17 DECLARATION of J. Alexander Hood II in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel #15 filed by Movants Sunil Chand, Amir Softic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certifications, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Pafiti, Jennifer)
January 13, 2017 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel #15 filed by Movants Sunil Chand, Amir Softic. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
January 13, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Movants Sunil Chand, Amir Softic. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pafiti, Jennifer)
January 13, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movants Sunil Chand, Amir Softic, (Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Sunil Chand (pty:bkmov), Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Amir Softic(pty:bkmov))(Pafiti, Jennifer)
January 13, 2017 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, identifying Centene Corp.. (Morrison, Peter)
January 13, 2017 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT DEFENDANTS FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke identifying Centene Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Morrison, Peter)
January 13, 2017 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott D. Musoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19189625) filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Peter)
January 13, 2017 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jay B. Kasner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19189530) filed by Defendants Centene C orp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morrison, Peter)
January 13, 2017 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter Bradley Morrison counsel for Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. Adding Peter Morrison as counsel of record for Defendants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff and Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (Attorney Peter Bradley Morrison added to party Centene Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Bradley Morrison added to party Michael F. Neidorff(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Bradley Morrison added to party Jeffrey A. Schwaneke(pty:dft))(Morrison, Peter)
December 5, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Effective December 12, 2016, Judge Birotte will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 7B on the 7th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 7B of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 15, 2016 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Centene Corp., Michael F. Neidorff, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke. (et)
November 15, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 15, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
November 14, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Israel Sanchez, (Prongay, Robert)
November 14, 2016 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Israel Sanchez. (Prongay, Robert)
November 14, 2016 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Israel Sanchez. (Prongay, Robert)
November 14, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18890116 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Israel Sanchez. (Attorney Robert Vincent Prongay added to party Israel Sanchez(pty:pla))(Prongay, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Israel Sanchez v. Centene Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Schwaneke
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Jay B Kasner
Represented By: Zachary Faigen
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corp.
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Jay B Kasner
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Represented By: Zachary Faigen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Neidorff
Represented By: Peter Bradley Morrison
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Represented By: Scott D. Musoff
Represented By: Jay B Kasner
Represented By: Zachary Faigen
Represented By: Winston P. Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Sanchez
Represented By: Robert V. Prongay
Represented By: Charles Henry Linehan
Represented By: Lesley F Portnoy
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Sheriffs' Pension & Relief Fund
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Represented By: David R. Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amir Softic
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UA Local 13 Pension Fund
Represented By: Danielle S Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard P. Wolsfeld, Jr.
Represented By: Robert V. Prongay
Represented By: Lionel Zevi Glancy
Represented By: Lesley F Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sunil Chand
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?