O'Neall v. Minor
Petitioner: Patrick Thomas O'Neall
Respondent: Dean Minor
Case Number: 4:2017cv01297
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Patrick Thomas O'Neall's motion for relief under Rule 60(b) is DENIED. ECF No. 39 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/16/2020. (AFC)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition of Patrick Thomas O'Neall for a writ of habeas corpus relief is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability shall not be issued. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/14/2020. (AFC)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for declaratory and preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED. ECF No. 33 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 05/29/2019. (KCB)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Petitioner must sh ow cause why this action should not be dismissed as time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Petitioner fails to respond to this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. (Show Cause Response due by 9/7/2017.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 17, 2017. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neall v. Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Thomas O'Neall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Minor
Represented By: Stephen David Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?