Dismuke v. St. Louis County Justice Center et al
Plaintiff: |
Nicolas Dismuke |
Defendant: |
St. Louis County Justice Center, Unknown Porter and Unknown Mitchell |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv01349 |
Filed: |
April 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Shirley Padmore Mensah |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2017 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will not authorize plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Court of Appeals. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 8/31/17. (EAB). (Copy sent to Court of Appeals on 8/31/17).
|
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. This matter is before the Court on the remand from the Court of Appeals to determine plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. Plaintiff has no right to take an appeal from the Courts Order of Partial Dismissal, and as a resu lt, the Court finds that the appeal is not taken in good faith. If plaintiff wishes to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, he must seek to do so in the appellate court. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will not authorize plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Court of Appeals. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 8/8/2017. (Order forwarded to USCA via interoffice mail this date.)(CBL)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 7 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $3.00 within twenty-on e (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) t hat the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants Lieutenant Unknown Porter and Lieutenant Unknown Mitchell. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's official-capacity claims are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant St. Louis County Justice Center is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 7/6/2017. (CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?