A.I.G. Agency, Inc. v. American International Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: A.I.G. Agency, Inc.
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv01502
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 67 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony R. Friedman for Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Friedman, Anthony)
June 10, 2019 Filing 66 ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT by Neutral: Winters, Bradley. Date of Conference: February 13, 2019. The parties participated in good faith. The parties did not achieve a settlement.(Winters, Bradley)
June 10, 2019 Filing 65 Electronic Notice of Noncompliance Review of case shows the ADR Compliance report has not been filed. A written motion requesting an extension of ADR Compliance report filing deadline must be filed with the court within 5 days. Notice only, no.pdf attached.(AAS)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:#https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf. If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf. If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or #moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov. (CSAW)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #63 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #60 Case Management Order - Amended,, by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Simon, Anthony) filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc.; GRANTED; SO ORDERED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/18/19. (CLA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #60 Case Management Order - Amended,, by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Simon, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Winters, Bradley A. Neutral selected by Parties (cc: Neutral)(KJS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 61 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. Neutral: Winters, Bradley A. Date of Conference: 02/13/2019 time: 9:00 am Location: Sher Corwin Winters LLC, 190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 1100, St. Louis, MO 63105(Simon, Anthony)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the Civil Justice Reform Act Expense and Delay Reduction Plan and the Differentiated Case Management Program of the United States District Court of the Eastern District of Missouri, and the Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan filed by the parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (See order for full details.) (Discovery Completion due by 7/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/20/2020 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/18/18. (KJS)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #58 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Case Management Order, by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael) filed by American International Group, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/14/18. (CLA)
December 13, 2018 Filing 58 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Case Management Order, by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Sher, Richard P. Neutral selected by Parties. (cc: neutral)(KJS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 56 Designation of Neutral by parties and ADR Conference Report by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. Neutral: Sher, Richard P. Date of Conference: 02/13/2019 time: 9:00 am Location: Sher Corwin Winters LLC, 190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 1100, St. Louis, MO 63105(Simon, Anthony)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: #53 Joint MOTION for Protective Order per Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/2/18. (KJS)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #53 Joint MOTION for Protective Order per Stipulation for Protective Order by Counter Claimant American International Group, Inc., Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Stipulation for Protective Order)(Kahn, Michael) filed by American International Group, Inc. ; GRANTED SO ORDERED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/02/2018. (AAS)
November 1, 2018 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Protective Order per Stipulation for Protective Order by Counter Claimant American International Group, Inc., Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Stipulation for Protective Order)(Kahn, Michael)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: mediation Designation of Lead Counsel: Anthony Simon ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/24/2019. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 6/7/2019. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 11/23/2018. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/20/18. (CLA)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: standard Motion to Join Parties due by 9/28/2018. Discovery Completion due by 4/29/2019. ADR Future Reference 11/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 09:30 AM before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/20/18. (CLA)
July 16, 2018 Filing 50 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. and Defendant American International Group, Inc. (Askew, Benjamin)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc.; DENIED AS MOOT. THE COURT HAS ORDERED PARTIES TO SUBMIT A JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN BY JULY 16, 2018. SEE ORDER DOC #48 . - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/9/18. (KJS)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties in this matter are to submit to the Court a Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan no later than July 16, 2018. (See Order For Details). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/16/2018.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 06/15/2018. (AAS)
June 13, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. (Askew, Benjamin) (**Changed from a "Notice" to a "Motion" event.**) Modified on 6/14/2018 (KJS).
May 18, 2018 Filing 46 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim by A.I.G. Agency, Inc..(Askew, Benjamin)
April 27, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. by American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certificate of Registration for AIG Mark (No. 1172557), #2 Exhibit B -- Certificate of Registration for AIG Mark (No. 2320184), #3 Exhibit C -- 1974 Missouri Fictitious Name Registration, #4 Exhibit D -- 2012 Court Filing by Plaintiff)(Kahn, Michael)
April 13, 2018 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant American International Group, Inc. Amendment to #43 Memorandum & Order, , filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. Related document: #43 Memorandum & Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google Search, #2 Exhibit B - Google Search)(Simon, Anthony)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss, [Doc. No. 15] is denied in part and granted in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counts III, IV and V are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is given 14 days from the date of this order to file an Amended Complaint. #15 ( Response to Court due by 4/13/2018.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/30/18. (CLA)
March 29, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. re #40 Notice of Supplemental Authority, Reply to Defendant AIG's Response (Askew, Benjamin)
March 22, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery , namely, Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Evidence #40 filed by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
March 20, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. Plaintiff's Supplemental Evidence of Continuing, Actual Confusion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Supplemental Evidence of Continuing Confusion)(Askew, Benjamin)
January 12, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery filed by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Askew, Benjamin)
January 5, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery filed by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael) filed by American International Group, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/27/17. (CLA)
December 22, 2017 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Begin Discovery by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Customer Confusion - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Customer Confusion - Subpoena, #3 Exhibit C - Customer Confusion - Email, #4 Exhibit D - Customer Confusion - Correspondence)(Askew, Benjamin) Modified on 1/5/2018 (CLA).
August 28, 2017 Filing 34 SURREPLY in Opposition to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. (KJS)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #32 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc.; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/28/17. (KJS)
August 25, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply)(Askew, Benjamin)
August 18, 2017 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by American International Group, Inc.; GRANTED - SO ORDERED ( Response to Court due by 8/18/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/9/17. (KJS)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #27 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc.; LEAVE GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/9/17. (KJS)
August 7, 2017 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #26 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
August 4, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Askew, Benjamin)
August 4, 2017 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Congressional Testimony of AIG's CEO)(Askew, Benjamin)
August 4, 2017 ***REMARK - Re: Doc #25 . Rule 26 - 3.02 Filing of Discovery and Disclosure Materials. (A) In civil actions, discovery and disclosure materials pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26, 30, 31, 33, 34, 35, and 36, and the certificates of their service, shall not be filed with the Court except as exhibits to a motion or memorandum. (KJS)
August 3, 2017 Filing 25 STIPULATION Parties' Stipulation to Depose Barbara Jean Wherry by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Askew, Benjamin)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen Bosco. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6065017) by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bosco, Stephen) filed by American International Group, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/25/17. (CLA)
July 24, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen Bosco. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6065017) by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bosco, Stephen)
July 20, 2017 Filing 22 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (LGK)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #17 Declaration,, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Askew, Benjamin) filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 7/14/17. (LGK)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #18 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica Lynn Falk. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6044727) by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Falk, Jessica) filed by American International Group, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 7/13/17. (ARL)
July 13, 2017 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #17 Declaration,, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Askew, Benjamin)
July 12, 2017 Filing 18 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica Lynn Falk. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6044727) by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Falk, Jessica)
July 10, 2017 Filing 17 DECLARATION filed by Defendant American International Group, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Declaration of Michael A. Kahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- US TM Reg. #1172557, #2 Exhibit B -- US TM Reg. #2320184, #3 Exhibit C -- US TM Reg. #2654367, #4 Exhibit D -- US TM Reg. #4331854, #5 Exhibit E -- US TM Reg. #4359323, #6 Exhibit F -- US TM Reg. #4576064, #7 Exhibit G -- Renewal Filings for US TM Reg. #1172557, #8 Exhibit H -- Renewal Filings for US TM #2320184, #9 Exhibit I -- Renewal Filings for US TM 2654367)(Kahn, Michael)
July 10, 2017 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
July 10, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
June 29, 2017 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah for all further proceedings. District Judge John A. Ross no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk of Court (GJL) on 6/29/17. (KKS)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another Judge.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/29/17. (KKS)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian E. Ferguson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6024693) by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ferguson, Brian) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/28/2017. (CLO)
June 28, 2017 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian E. Ferguson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6024693) by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ferguson, Brian)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. ( Response to Court due by 7/10/2017.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/1/17. (KKS)
May 31, 2017 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
May 31, 2017 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A. Kahn for Defendant American International Group, Inc.. (Kahn, Michael)
May 17, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. American International Group, Inc. served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Askew, Benjamin)
May 15, 2017 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Benjamin R. Askew. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (MFG)
May 12, 2017 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony G. Simon for Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Simon, Anthony)
May 12, 2017 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. Parent companies: None., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: No.,. (Askew, Benjamin)
May 12, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff A.I.G. Agency, Inc. Process Server: Kevin Dunn (Askew, Benjamin)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant American International Group, Inc. with receipt number 0865-5952620, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by A.I.G. Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google Search Results, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons)(Askew, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.I.G. Agency, Inc. v. American International Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Kahn
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Falk
Represented By: Stephen P. Bosco
Represented By: Brian Edward Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.I.G. Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony G. Simon
Represented By: Benjamin R. Askew
Represented By: Anthony R. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?