Sauceda v. USA
Petitioner: Isidoro Sauceda
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2017cv01510
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NUNC PRO TUNC OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant=s motion to vacate, set aside, or correct illegal sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DENIED. See Rule 4 of the Rules Governing ' 2255 Proceedings.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a Certificate of Appealability. See 28 U.S.C. ' 2253. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/29/17. (CLA)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant=s motion to vacate, set aside, or correct illegal sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is DENIED. See Rule 4 of the Rules Governing ' 2255 Proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a Certificate of Appealability. See 28 U.S.C. ' 2253. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/27/17. (JAB)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant must show cause, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, why this action should not be dismissed as untimely. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if movant does not comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. (Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/12/17. (KJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sauceda v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Jeannette Graviss(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isidoro Sauceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?