Adams v. Hillis et al
Plaintiff: |
Tarell A. Adams |
Defendant: |
Ryan Hillis, Brandon A. Elkins and Cassie L. Kobert |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv01805 |
Filed: |
June 26, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Francois |
Presiding Judge: |
David D. Noce |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 23, 2021 |
Filing
93
MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/23/2021. (JMP)
|
March 30, 2021 |
Filing
78
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 53 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's unopposed request to voluntarily dismiss defendant Cassie Kobert from this action and h is claim for invasion of privacy contained in Count V is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Zoom status conference to discuss further proceedings is set for April 29, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Go to zoomgov.com and enter the ID and password: Meeting ID: 160 599 0218 Password: 346672.( Status Conference set for 4/29/2021 01:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 3/30/2021. (JMP)
|
September 21, 2017 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $2.22 within thirty (30 ) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) this case number; and (4) the statement t hat the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint, pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with the Office of the Missouri A ttorney General, as to defendants Ryan Hillis, Brandon A. Elkins, and Cassie L. Kobert in their individual capacities. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in their individual capacities, defendants Ryan Hillis, Brandon A. Elkins, and Cassie L. Kobert shall reply to the complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the official capacity claims against defendants Ryan Hillis, Brandon A. Elkins, and Cassie L. Kobert are DISMISSED. An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 9/21/2017. (CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?