Moore v. City of St. Louis et al

Plaintiff: Edward Allen Moore
Defendant: City of St. Louis, St. Patrick Center, Peter and Paul Community Services, Inc., Biddle House Opportunity Center, Keneesha Unknown, Lyda Krewson, Emma Unknown, Biddle House Staff Person Number 3, Biddle House Staff Person Number 4, Biddle House Staff Person Number 5 and Biddle House Staff Person Number 6
Case Number: 4:2017cv01912
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of St. Louis and Mayor Krewson's Motion to Dismiss 33 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Peter and Paul Community Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss 40 is GRA NTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant St. Patrick Center's Motion to Dismiss 52 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on the Court's own motion, Defendant Biddle House is DISMISSED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 6 and Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction 11 are DENIED as moot. A separate judgment of dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/27/18. (KKS)
January 22, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 65 is DENIED without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/22/18. (KKS)
August 4, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 60(b)(2) and (3) Motion for Relief from Judgment 18 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/4/2017. (CLO)
July 14, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for temporary restraining order and renewed temporary restraining order [Doc. # 2 and # 9 ] are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service on the second amended complaint shall effectuate in accordance with the written order entered on July 13, 2017. See Docket No. 15. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/14/2017. (CLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. City of St. Louis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Allen Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Louis
Represented By: H. Anthony Relys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Patrick Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter and Paul Community Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biddle House Opportunity Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keneesha Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyda Krewson
Represented By: H. Anthony Relys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biddle House Staff Person Number 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biddle House Staff Person Number 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biddle House Staff Person Number 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biddle House Staff Person Number 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?