Vardiman et al v. Booker, Jr et al
Plaintiff: Norvett Vardiman, Ronnie Gooch, Ania Warner, Michael Hudson, Dennis Royal-Reed and Charles Singleton
Defendant: Aaron Booker, Jr and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2017cv02358
Filed: September 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 40 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Norvett Vardiman and against Defendant Aaron Bo oker, Jr., as to Count IV of the Complaint (Negligence). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Ronnie Gooch and against Defendant Aaron Booker, Jr., as to Count VIII of the Complaint (Negligence). IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Ania Warner and against Defendant Aaron Booker, Jr., as to Count XII of the Complaint (Negligence). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Michael Hudson and against D efendant Aaron Booker, Jr., as to Count XVI of the Complaint (Negligence). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Dennis Royal-Reed and against Defendant Aaron Booker, Jr., as to Count XX of the Complaint (Negligence) . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Charles Singleton and against Defendant Aaron Booker, Jr., as to Count XXIV of the Complaint (Negligence). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Hearing on Damages shall be held on Octob er 13, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum in support of their damages, together with exhibits in support thereof, on or before September 28, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Default Judgment to Defendant Aaron Booker, Jr., to the address at which he was served, 238 Olympia Drive, St. Louis, MO, 63135. (A copy has been sent to A. Booker as directed) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/10/2020. (TMT)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant United States of America's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (ECF No. 24 ) is GRANTED. A separate Order of Dismissal accompanies this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/09/2020. (KCB)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 15 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order and Pl aintiffs' Complaint (ECF No. 1 ) via regular USPS mail and UPS mail to Defendant Aaron Booker, Jr., at the address at which he wasserved, 238 Olympia Drive, St. Louis, MO 63135. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on August 20, 2019. (Memorandum and Order and Complaint sent to Defendant Aaron Booker, Jr. via USPS mail and UPS mail.) (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vardiman et al v. Booker, Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norvett Vardiman
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Gooch
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ania Warner
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hudson
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Royal-Reed
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Singleton
Represented By: John L.B. Wilbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Booker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?