Country Preferred Insurance Company v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: |
Country Preferred Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Christopher Lee and Sandra Lee |
Counter_claimant: |
Sandra Lee and Christopher Lee |
Counter_defendant: |
Sandra Lee and Christopher Lee |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv02369 |
Filed: |
September 6, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Within US but Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
Catherine D. Perry |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 4, 2018 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for judgment on the pleadings 24 is granted. A separate Judgment is entered this same date.. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 5/4/18. (KKS)
|
February 7, 2018 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 conference currently set for Friday, February 9, 2018 is cancelled and will be reset by further Order of the Court. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings by no later than Monday, February 12, 2018. Defendants shall file their opposition brief by no later than Monday, February 26, 2018, and plaintiff may file any reply brief by Monday, March 5, 2018. The briefs shall comply with the page limitations set forth in the Court's local rules. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/7/2018. (CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Country Preferred Insurance Company v. Lee et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Country Preferred Insurance Company |
Represented By: |
David T. Butsch |
Represented By: |
Christopher E. Roberts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Christopher Lee |
Represented By: |
Reno R. Cova, III |
Represented By: |
Talmage E. Newton, IV |
Represented By: |
James J. Rosemergy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sandra Lee |
Represented By: |
Reno R. Cova, III |
Represented By: |
Talmage E. Newton, IV |
Represented By: |
James J. Rosemergy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Sandra Lee |
Represented By: |
Reno R. Cova, III |
Represented By: |
Talmage E. Newton, IV |
Represented By: |
James J. Rosemergy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Christopher Lee |
Represented By: |
Reno R. Cova, III |
Represented By: |
Talmage E. Newton, IV |
Represented By: |
James J. Rosemergy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Sandra Lee |
Represented By: |
Reno R. Cova, III |
Represented By: |
Talmage E. Newton, IV |
Represented By: |
James J. Rosemergy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Christopher Lee |
Represented By: |
Reno R. Cova, III |
Represented By: |
Talmage E. Newton, IV |
Represented By: |
James J. Rosemergy |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?