Campbell et al v. Baylard, Billington, Dempsey & Jensen, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: Dave Campbell and Catrenia Dawn Campbell
Defendant: Baylard, Billington, Dempsey & Jensen, P.C., David Lawrence Baylard, Damian Robert Struzzi, Woodland Lakes Trusteeship, Inc., Woodland Lakes Community Neighborhood Watch, Deborah Ann Clutter, Linda Nolen, Crystal Michelle Kallansrud, Law Office of Gary G. Matheny, Gary Glen Matheny, Robert Murphy, Wendy Lynn Wexler-Horn, Douglas R. Bader, Cheryl Davis, Laura Thielmeier Roy, Washington County Sheriff's Department, Thomas Leon Colyott, Linda Mantia, Cynthia Borgard, Lance E. Wood, Arthur Hurlburt, Craig Kinmann, Francis Oscar Darian, Jr., Russell Richards, Lawrence Deis, James Moldovan, Michael Frank, David Vilcek, Michael Bernheisel, John Buhmann, Bryan Griffith, Sr., Dora Rulo, Darin Carter, Thomas Larue Smith, Jr., William David Mitchell, The McClatchy Company, Anonymous Topix Posters and Unknown Barton
Case Number: 4:2017cv02390
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2018 291 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that Plaintiffs' motion to disqualify the undersigned for cause (Doc. No. 246 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of this Court's May 17, 2018 Or der (Doc. No. 248 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file additional memorandum in support of Plaintiffs' motion for leave to allow limited discovery (Doc. No. 255 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file motion to allow limited discovery as to all Defendants (Doc. No. 249 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motions to withdraw (Doc. Nos. 247 , 272 , 279 , and 285 ) are GRANTE D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an additional memorandum (Doc. No. 286 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend their notice of appeal (Doc. No. 273 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended objection to the Court's February 26, 2018 Order (Doc. No 274 ) will be construed as a notice to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to enter an additional memorandum to object to attorney Sean Dolan's actions (Doc. No. 264 ) will be construed as a notice to the Court. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file oppositions to Defendants' five motions to dismiss out of time (Doc. No. 290 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to detach the responses in opposition and docket them as separate entries. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/10/18. (JAB)
May 17, 2018 233 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a supplemental pleading (Doc. No. 227 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Defendants motion to allow limited discovery as to phone records (Doc. No. 230 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/17/18. (JAB)
May 4, 2018 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to withdraw their motion to stay (Doc. No. 223 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to appear telephonically (Doc. No. 222 ) is DENIED as moot . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled on May 9, 2018, is CANCELLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a third amended complaint (Doc. No. 224 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to detac h Doc. No. [224-2] and docket it as Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to dismiss filed by Defendants David Lawrence Baylard, Baylard, Billington, Dempsey & Jensen, P.C., and Damian Robert Struzzi (Doc. No. 120); Michael Bernheisel, Cynthia Borgard, John Buhmann, Darin Carter, Deborah Ann Clutter, Thomas Leon Colyott, Francis Oscar Darian, Jr, Cheryl Davis, Lawrence Deis, Michael Frank, Bryan Griffith, Sr, Arthur Hurlburt, Crystal Michelle Kallansru d, Craig Kinneman, Linda Mantia, William David Mitchell, James Moldovan, Robert Murphy, Linda Nolen, Russell Richards, Dora Rulo, Thomas Larue Smith, Jr, David Vilcek, Lance E. Wood, and Woodland Lakes Trusteeship, Inc. (Doc. No. 125 ); Wendy We xler Horn, Douglas R. Bader, and Laura Thielmeier Roy (Doc. No. 127 ); Law Office of Gary G. Matheny, and Gary Glen Matheny (Doc. No. 129 ); and Defendant Woodland Lakes Community Neighborhood Watch (Doc. No. 202 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/4/2018. (CLO)
March 22, 2018 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Woodland Lakes Community Neighborhood Watchs motion to set aside clerks entry of default (Doc. No. 176 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Woodland Lakes Community Neighborh ood Watchs motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading out of time (Doc. No. 177 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall detach Doc. Nos. 177- 2 and 177-3 and docket them as Defendant Woodland Lakes Community Neighborhood Watchs Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motions for leave to file additional memoranda in opposition to Defendant Woodland Lakes Community Neighborhood Watchs motions to set aside and for extension of time (Doc. Nos. 196 and 197 ) are GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/22/18. (JAB)
February 6, 2018 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motions to strike (Doc. Nos. 132 , 134 , 136 , and 138 ) are DENIED. Plaintiffs are directed to file any opposition to Defendants' pending motions to dismiss the second amended complaint (Doc. Nos. 120 , 125 , 127 , and 129 ) on or before March 1, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw (Doc. 141 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/6/2018. (CLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. Baylard, Billington, Dempsey & Jensen, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylard, Billington, Dempsey & Jensen, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lawrence Baylard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Robert Struzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodland Lakes Trusteeship, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodland Lakes Community Neighborhood Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Ann Clutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Michelle Kallansrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Gary G. Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Glen Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Lynn Wexler-Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Thielmeier Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Leon Colyott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Mantia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Borgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Hurlburt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Kinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Oscar Darian, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Deis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Moldovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Vilcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bernheisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Buhmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Griffith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Rulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darin Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Larue Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William David Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McClatchy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anonymous Topix Posters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrenia Dawn Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?