Kulhanek v. Griffith et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Kulhanek
Defendant: Cindy Griffith, Greg Dunn, Ian Wallace, Alan Earls, Eric Burch, Joe Arcand, William Milam, Travis Crews, Stan Payne, Jennifer Price, Bruce Dunn, Vincent Cain, Donald Walcott, Robert McMahan, Rick Menteer, Will Hunter, Unknown Batiste, Unknown Nichols, Unknown Declue, Unknown King, Unknown Klein, Unknown Sistry, Unknown Lee, Unknown Renshaw, Unknow Isgrig, Unknown Stegall, Unknown Hand, Jason Davis, Amber Rayfield, Kimberly Price, Christine Henson, Frederick Knapp, Patrick Brauner, Adam Randazzo, Michael Sandberg, Ryan Brooks and Jeffrey Jones
Case Number: 4:2017cv02431
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Cindy Griffith, Greg Dunn, Rick Menteer, and Will Hunter's Motion for Summary Judgement is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 53 ). A separate Judgement will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/27/2020. (CLO)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to file sealed documents (Doc. No. 78 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' request (Doc. No. 80 ) to provide Plaintiff with a redacted version of the bed movement logs (found at Doc. No. 79 at Ex. 2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to stay summary judgment is DENIED. (Doc. No. 72 ). Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' summary judgment motion within thirty (30) days of this Order.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/16/20. (KKS)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' request for an extension of two weeks to produce documents explaining why Plaintiff was placed in a camera cell is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants will be granted an extension of seven (7) days to either produce the outstanding documents or explain why those documents are irrelevant or should not be produced. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/6/2020. (CLO)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for production of documents and camera footage (Doc. No. 74 ) is DENIED in part. The Court will not direct Defendants to produce: (1) any and all documents pertaining to secu rity orders starting on January 25, 2016, August 19, 2016, and February 21, 2017; (2) logs detailing the periodic reviews of Plaintiff's security orders; (3) search logs starting February 21, 2017 through November 31, 2017; or (4) any and all logs that claim Plaintiff was suicidal or required close-observation from February 21, 2017, through April 20, 2017. The Court will direct Defendants to either produce the bed movement logs from February 21, 2017 through April 20, 2017, the docu ments explaining why Plaintiff was placed in a camera cell, and the handheld and wing camera footage of Plaintiff being searched from February 21, 2017 through November 31, 2017, or respond as to why these materials should not be discoverable within seven (7) days of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. No. 73 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/26/20. (JAB)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. No. 63 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide this Court with a response within fifteen (15) days of this order identifying what documents and video footage he asserts will support his claim, as well as a description of each items relevance to the case. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/30/20. (JAB)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will convert Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. No. 53 ) into a motion for summary judgment, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(d). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the above, Defendants shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to file any supplemental briefing setting forth materials pertinent to their motion. Plaintiff shall have 30 days thereafter to file any supplemental response, and Defendants shall have 14 days thereafter to reply. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/26/2019. (CLO)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defense counsel shall have ten (10) days to provide the Court with a response in writing as to whether the Missouri Attorney General's Office will waive service on behalf of Greg Dunn in accordanc e with the waiver of service agreement this Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney General's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if defense counsel is unable to waive service on behalf of defendant Greg Dunn, counsel shall provide under seal and ex parte, a notice to the Court indicating the reason counsel is unable to waive service as to defendant Greg Dunn. If defendant Dunn is no longer employed by the Missouri Department of Corrections, counsel will need to provide, under seal and ex parte, defendant Dunn's last known home address so that the Court can effectuate service of summons on defendant Dunn through the U.S. Marshal's Office.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/28/19. (KKS)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss this action [Doc. # 21 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss [Doc. # 23 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defense counsel shall provide the Court with a response within ten (10) days of the date of this Order as to whether the Missouri Attorney General's Office will waive service on behalf of defendan t Greg Dunn in accordance with the Waiver of Service Agreement this Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney General's Office as to Missouri Department of Corrections Employees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if defense counsel is unable to waiv e service on behalf of defendant Greg Dunn, counsel shall provide, under seal, and ex parte, a notice to the Court indicating the reason counsel is unable to accept the waiver of service as to defendant Greg Dunn. If defendant Dunn is no longer emp loyed by the Missouri Department of Corrections, counsel will need to provide, under seal and ex parte, defendant Dunn's last known home address so the Court can effectuate service of summons on defendant Dunn through the U.S. Marshal's Office.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for entry of default [Doc. # 12 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 24 ] is DENIED AT THIS TIME. Plaintiff has shown that he is able to repr esent his own interests at this time; and this case is not complex. The Court will allow plaintiff to renew his appointment of counsel if necessary at a later point in the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion for extension of t ime to file a responsive pleading [Doc. # 20 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file their Answer in this action within twenty-one days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/14/19. (JAB)(cc: Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $2.91 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. This case is assigned to Track: 5. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/23/2018. (CLO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kulhanek v. Griffith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Kulhanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Arcand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Walcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Menteer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Batiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Declue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Renshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow Isgrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Stegall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Rayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Brauner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Randazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?