Kosin v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Charm Kosin
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2017cv02435
Filed: September 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Noelle C. Collins
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DISMISSES this matter, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/6/19. (JAB)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion for Summary Judgment 38 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than October 15, 2018, counsel for the parties shall mee t and confer and file with the Court a revised joint proposed scheduling plan to set a schedule for all remaining discovery as well as all other outstanding matters, including referral to mediation and a trial date. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/24/18. (EAB)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion to Compel 32 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff Charm Kosin shall answer all interrogatories fully, under oath; produce all documents requested; and serve upon defendant a certification that she has fully complied with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34 in her production. All objections to the propounded interrogatories and re quests for production are waived. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay defendant its reasonable attorney's fees in preparing and filing its motion to compel. Failure to comply with this Order will, if requested, result in the entry of sanctions which could include, if requested and among other things, dismissal of the case with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/2/18. (EAB)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 10 is denied in part, and denied as moot in part, as provided in this Memorandum and Order. This case will be set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference by separate Order. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/24/17. (KXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kosin v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charm Kosin
Represented By: Shawn M Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Hassing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?