Molina et al v. St. Louis, Missouri, City of et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Molina, Christina Vogel and Peter Groce
Defendant: St. Louis, Missouri, City of, St. Clair, Illinois, County of and John Doe I-VI
Case Number: 4:2017cv02498
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for summary judgment is DENIED on Count I and GRANTED on Counts II and III. As to Count IV, the motion is DENIED as it relates to Plaintiffs First Amendment claims on Count I and GRANTED as it relates to Plaintiffs Fourth Amendment claims on Counts II and III. ECF No. 169 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion to strike Plaintiffs exhibits (ECF No. 183 , Exhibits 7, 8, 11, 15, and 25) is DENIED. ECF No. 191. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/31/21. (KJS)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth above. ECF No. 157 . Plaintiff shall execute medical authorizations within the parameters set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall work together in good faith to ensure Ms. Vogels privacy with respect to all records produced, in a manner consistent with the Protective Order previously entered in this case (ECF No. 150 ). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/26/2020. (JMP)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of Defendants City of St. Louis, Missouri, and St. Clair County, Illinois to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint as to them are GRANTED. (ECF Nos. 11 and 17 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 24, 2018. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina et al v. St. Louis, Missouri, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Molina
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Vogel
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Groce
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Jessie M. Steffan
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis, Missouri, City of
Represented By: Andrew David Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Clair, Illinois, County of
Represented By: Thomas R. Ysursa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I-VI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?