Grandberry v. Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nakeitra Grandberry
Defendant: Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv02531
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Attorneys Fees, [Doc. No. 98 ], is denied.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 06/22/2020. (AAT)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, [Doc. No. 27 ], is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 26 ], is denied.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 29 ], is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will notify the parties of the trial date in a separate order.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 05/03/2019. (AAS)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Leave to Amend, [Doc. No. 44 ], is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike is denied. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/4/19. (KJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandberry v. Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakeitra Grandberry
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical-Commercial Audit, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J. Barton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?