Clemons v. Brauer et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Clemons
Defendant: Joseph Brauer, Chris Pappas, Nels C. Moss, Ben Coleman, Steven Jacobsmeyer, Raymond Grist, Gary Stitum and Robert Meyer
Case Number: 4:2017cv02739
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Jean C. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Brauer and Pappas motions to dismiss are DENIED. [ECF Nos. 22 and 23 ]A separate Case Management Order will issue with this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/13/2018. (AAS)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Joseph Brauer and Chris Pappas. Service shall be effectuated at the address provided by the Assistant C ity Counselor in his response to the Courts Order of October 9, 2018. [ECF No. 13] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis in this action, service shall be effectuated by the United States Marshals Office through summons, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of the summons and the return of summons shall be filed under seal and will not be served upon plaintiff, as these documents will contain defendants Brauer and Pappass last known home address.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/12/18. (CLA)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall file, under seal and ex parte, the last known home addresses for defendants Joseph Brauer, Chris Pappas, Ben Coleman, and Nels C. Moss within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Response to Court due by 10/23/2018.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/09/2018. (AAS)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint, pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with City Counselors Office, as to defendants Josep h Brauer, Chris Pappas, Ben Coleman, and Nels C. Moss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that as to defendants Steven Jacobsmeyer, Raymond Grist, Robert Meyer, David A. Robbins, Gary Stittum, James Conway, Nessby Moore, Jr., Rita M. Kraph, Robert Scheetz, Robe rt Bauman, Daniel Nichols, Mike Guzzy, Richard Trevor, John Walsh, Joseph Nickerson, George Bender, Jack Huelsmann, and Harry B. Hegger, Vincent C. Schoemehl, the Board of Commissioners of the Metropolitan Police Department of the St. Louis City, and the Supervisory Board of the Metropolitan Police Department of St. Louis City the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/12/18. (KJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Brauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Brauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nels C. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jacobsmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Grist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Stitum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?