Partee v. Eldercare Management Services

Plaintiff: Edward Partee, Jr.
Defendant: Eldercare Management Services
Case Number: 4:2017cv02827
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is GRANTED. ECF No. 23 . The Clerk of Court shall file ECF No. 26 as Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. ECF No. 21 . However, Defendant may, no later than 14 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, refile its motion to dismiss or file a new such motion addressed to the second amended complaint . Plaintiff shall have seven days to file any opposition to such a motion to dismiss, and Defendant shall have seven days thereafter to file any reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further leave to amend will be granted to Plaintiff absent good cause shown. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 06/25/2018. (KCB)
February 23, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. [ECF No. 4 ]. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 02/23/2018. (KCB)
February 12, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. 2 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit a copy of his EEOC right-to-sue letter, if he has received one , within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 12, 2018. (BRP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Partee v. Eldercare Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Partee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldercare Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?