Davidson v. Fulton State Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Dean Bryan Davidson
Defendant: Fulton State Hospital, Southeast Missouri Mental Health Center and Stephen David Hawke
Case Number: 4:2018cv00103
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion requesting transfer [Doc. # 30 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SHALL NOT ACCEPT ANY ADDITIONAL PLEADINGS FROM PLAINTIFF IN THIS MATTER. Any filings from plaintiff shall be returned to him. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/2/19. (KXS)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion requesting a change of venue [Doc. # 22 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall not accept any additional filings from plaintiff in this matter, as pl aintiffs action is currently pending on appeal. Any filings from plaintiff shall be returned to him with a letter telling plaintiff to file his motion with the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/22/2018. (AFC)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion requesting a change of venue and recusal of this Court in this matter [Doc. # 19 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 8/13/2018. (AFC)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [Doc. # 8 ] is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/16/2018. (NEP)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § l 915(e)(2)(B). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 29, 2018. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Fulton State Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Bryan Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Missouri Mental Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen David Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?