Wood et al v. Neidorff et al
Plaintiff: Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, Centene Corporation, John R. Roberts, Richard A. Gephardt, David L. Steward, Frederick H. Eppinger, Robert K. Ditmore, Michael F. Neidorff, Tommy G. Thompson, Orlando Ayala and Vicki B. Escarra
Petitioner: Harkishan Parekh
Case Number: 4:2018cv00393
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Referring Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (ECF No. 91) by Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson, Orlando Ayala, K. Rone Baldwin, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Carol E. Goldman, Pamela A. Joseph, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority)Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-00113-CDP, 4:18-cv-00393-CDP, 4:18-cv-02085-RLW(Smith, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING PLEADING AND MOTION SCHEDULE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule 26 is GRANTED as follows: 1. Defendants are not required to move against, answer or otherwise respond to either of the complaints at this time. 2. No later than January 11, 2019, counsel for plaintiff Harkishan Parekh and for plaintiffs Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund must meet and confer and attempt to resolve their competing claims to be lead plaintiff and lead counsel. a. If they can agree, they must, no later than January 22, 2019 file a joint motion for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel, setting out any agreement and why that is an appropriate resolution of this initial dispute, and setting out which of the two complaints should become the operative complaint in this matter or whether they agree to file a consolidated amended complaint. Any proposed consolidated amended complaint must be attached to the joint motion. b. Assuming no agreement is reached, then each plaintiff group must, no later than January 22, 2019, file a single motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and lead counsel and a statement whether, if that side is appointed lead plaintiff/counsel, they wish to proceed on their previously-filed complaint or wish to file an amended complaint. If they wish to file an amended complaint, the proposed amended complaint must be attached to that motion. Each side must also, by that same date, file a memorandum in support of its position, along with any declarations or other evidence it deems appropriate. The memoranda in support are limited to 20 pages each and must cover all issues (lead plaintiff, lead counsel, amendment) in that sides single memorandum. No later than February 13, 2019 the competing plaintiffs must file any briefs in opposition, which are limited to 15 pages in length. Any reply briefs must be filed no later than March 1, 2019 and are limited to 5 pages in length. These page limitations will not be extended. 3. If counsel believe any of this material should be filed under seal or should not be provided to any other party in the case, they must meet and confer with all counsel and seek to reach agreement for an appropriate protective order. If they are unable to agree, then they must file a joint motion for a protective order setting out the position of each party to the case no later than January 22, 2019. No further briefing will be allowed on the protective-order issue. 4. Defendants shall have 45 days after the Court Order resolving the issues of lead plaintiff, lead counsel and operative complaint, to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the operative complaint. 5. If defendants move to dismiss the complaint, lead plaintiff shall file its opposition no later than 45 days after the filing of the motion to dismiss. 6. Defendants shall file their reply to any opposition made by lead plaintiff no later than 30 days after the filing of lead plaintiff's opposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further briefs and pleadings shall be filed in Case No. 4:18CV113 CDP only, and the Clerk of Court is directed to administratively close Case No. 4:18CV393 CDP, after docketing a copy of this order in that case. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/13/2018. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-00113-CDP, 4:18-cv-00393-CDP(CBL)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Doc. #17 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Movants Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, and Appoint Lead Counsel (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate Case Number 4:18-cv-00393-CDP into Case Number 4:18-cv-00113-NAB. Following such consolidation, the Clerk is ordered to reassign the consolidated case to District Judge Catherine D. Perry, who has agreed to such reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 12/7/18. (KJS)
April 17, 2018 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P. Conran for Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Conran, Joseph)
April 17, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION Joint Motion for Order Setting Pleading and Motion Schedule by Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson, Movant Harkishan Parekh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher)
April 17, 2018 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Centene Corporation. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Smith, Christopher)
April 17, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher A. Smith for Defendants Orlando Ayala, Centene Corporation, Robert K. Ditmore, Frederick H. Eppinger, Vicki B. Escarra, Richard A. Gephardt, Michael F. Neidorff, John R. Roberts, Jeffrey A. Schwaneke, David L. Steward, Tommy G. Thompson. (Smith, Christopher)
March 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiff Harkishan Parekh with case number 4:18-cv-00113 (Attachments: #1 Attachment PLAINTIFF HARKISHAN PAREKH'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL)(Neill, Joseph)
March 23, 2018 Filing 12 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (KXS)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motions for Pro Hac Vice (Docs. #9 , #10 ) filed by Geoffrey M. Johnson and Scott R. Jacobsen, counsel for Plaintiffs Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund, are GRANTED. Geoffrey M. Johnson and Scott R. Jacobsen are hereby admitted for the purpose of representing Plaintiffs Laura Wood and Peoria Police Pension Fund in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 03/22/2018. (KBL)
March 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Geoffrey M. Johnson. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6444219) by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Geoffrey)
March 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott R. Jacobsen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6444183) by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jacobsen, Scott)
March 15, 2018 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Greg G. Gutzler for Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint pursuant to Local Rule 13.05 (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 3/14/2018. (KBL)
March 12, 2018 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
March 12, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 11 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Greg G. Gutzler. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
March 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood with case number 4:18-cv-00113 (Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document : Verified Shareholder Derivation Complaint by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document : Verified Shareholder Derivation Complaint by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood Process Server: Rick Eisen (Gutzler, Greg)
March 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number 0865-6423261, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Peoria Police Pension Fund, Laura Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Neidorff, #4 Summons Ditmore, #5 Summons Steward, #6 Summons Roberts, #7 Summons Thompson, #8 Summons Eppinger, #9 Summons Gephardt, #10 Summons Ayala, #11 Summons Escarra, #12 Summons Schwaneke, #13 Summons Centene Corporation)(Gutzler, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Neidorff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Schwaneke
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Roberts
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Gephardt
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Steward
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick H. Eppinger
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Ditmore
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Neidorff
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy G. Thompson
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Ayala
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki B. Escarra
Represented By: Joseph P. Conran
Represented By: Christopher A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wood
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peoria Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Greg G. Gutzler
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Scott R. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harkishan Parekh
Represented By: Joseph V. Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?