Wallace v. Pharma Medica Research, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ian Wallace
Defendant: Pharma Medica Research, Inc. and Unknown Persons
Case Number: 4:2018cv00396
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Charles A. Shaw
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Dismissal Order, or in the alternative for leave to file an amended complaint, is DENIED. (Doc. 18). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 10/24/2018. (MRC)
August 16, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: The motion is GRANTED to the extent that defendant Pharma Medica Research, Inc. shall respond to plaintiff's I nterrogatory Nos. 3, 4, and 5, and produce documents responsive to plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents No. 4(a), by August 27, 2018. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. [Doc. 13]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by September 26, 2018, that alleges sufficient jurisdictional facts as to all defendants named therein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Case Management Order is vacated. [Doc. 10] Failure to comply timely and fully with this Order will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( Response to Court due by 9/26/2018.). Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/16/2018. (MRC)
June 15, 2018 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff is granted leave to promptly ascertain through appropriate discovery requests the identi ty of the "Unknown Persons" defendants, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1), and file pr oof of service upon them within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. The named and served defendant shall cooperate with plaintiff in the discovery process. Upon learning the identity of the "Unknown Persons" defendants, plaintiff s hall promptly amend his complaint to add these individuals as parties. Failure to comply timely and fully with this Order will result in dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's claims against any unserved defendants. Response to Court due by 8/14/2018.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 6/15/2018. (MRC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Pharma Medica Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharma Medica Research, Inc.
Represented By: Terese A. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Persons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Wallace
Represented By: Paul Ervin Rademacher
Represented By: Brian M. Wendler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?