Huskey v. Burris et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Huskey, Jr.
Defendant: Paul Burris, Dionne Kelly, William E. Hickle, Brendon Fox, Matthew Crowell, Rick Lisenbe, Matthew Shults, Steven Lorts, Unknown Dowdy, Unknown Alexander, Unknown Reed, Unknown Jones, Carl Unknown, Unknown Adminstrator, Unknown Asst. Administrator and Unknown Traning Supervisor
Case Number: 4:2018cv00731
Filed: May 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Phelps
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED. ECF No. 58 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before September 25, 2019, Plaintiff shall provide his initial disclosures to Defendants and file a notice of compliance with the Court. Plaintiff is advised that the disclosures and documents themselves must be served directly on defense counsel, and only the notice of compliance should be filed with the Court. (Response to Court due by 9/25/2019.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/5/19. (EAB)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a continuance (Docket No. 49) is DENIED at this time. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 17, 2019. (MCB)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Kelley's motion (Doc. No. 33 ) for additional time in which to file a response to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. Defendant Kelley's mem orandum in opposition (Doc. No. 37 ) is deemed timely filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Shults' motion (Doc. No. 42 ) for additional time in which to file a response to Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend is GRANTED. Defendant Shults shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order to file a response to Plaintiff's motion. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/16/2019. (CLO)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Shults' motion for additional time in which to file a responsive pleading (Docket No. 22 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Shults shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order in which to file a responsive pleading. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/12/2019. (AFC)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for leave to file an answer and affirmative defenses (Docket No. 20 ) out of time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall have ten (10) days from the date of this order in which to file an answer and affirmative defenses. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 13, 2019. (BRP)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 17 ) is DENIED at this time. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on February 6, 2019. (BRP)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.81 within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statem ent that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 4 ) is DENIED at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for subpoenas (Docket No. 5 ) is DENIED as premature. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon defendant Dionne Kelly in her individual capacity as to plaintiff's claims that she failed to allow him to see the doctor and intentionally withheld prescribed medication. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon defendant Matthew Shults in his individual capacity as to plaintiff's claim that he intentiona lly denied plaintiff dental treatment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendants Unknown Administrator/President, Unknown Assistant Administrator/Vice President, Unknown Training Supervisor/Coordinator, Paul Burris, Wil liam Hickle, Brendon Fox, Matthew Crowell, Brittany Rowe, Rick Lisenbe, Steven Lorts, Unknown Dowdy, Unknown Alexander, Unknown Reed, Unknown Jones, and Unknown Carl are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's clai ms against defendants Dionne Kelly and Matthew Shults in their officials capacities are DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendants Dionne Kelly and Matthew Shults in their individual capaci ties are DISMISSED without prejudice, with the exception of plaintiff's claims against Kelly for failing to allow him to see a doctor and intentionally withholding prescribed medications, and plaintiff's claims against Shults for intenti onally denying him dental treatment. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/2/19. (KXS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huskey v. Burris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Huskey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dionne Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Hickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendon Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Lisenbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lorts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Adminstrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Asst. Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Traning Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?