Clayton v. Brennan et al
Plaintiff: Rosalind A. Clayton
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan and American Postal Worker Union AFL-CIO
Case Number: 4:2018cv01039
Filed: June 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER :IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 34 ), is DENIED IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Permissive Joinder (Doc. 38 ), i s DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL FILE, no more than fifteen (15) days from the date of this order, a short, concise complaint, that: 1. Identifies each specific legal claim she is asserting; 2. Identifies the party or parties ag ainst whom each specific legal claim is asserted; and 3. Lists under each specific legal claim only those facts which are necessary to that claim. Plaintiff's complaint SHALL BE LIMITED to the current named Defendants: A. Megan J. Brennan, Post master General, United States Postal Service; and B. American Postal Worker Union AFL-CIO. If Plaintiff fails to comply with the Court's instructions regarding her new amended complaint, it will dismiss her suit without prejudice. Response to Court due by 10/23/2019.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/8/19. (KKS)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Doc. 34 ), is DENIED IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Permissive Joinder (Doc. 38 ), is DENIED . IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL FILE a short, concise complaint, that: 1. Identifies each specific legal claim she is asserting; 2. Identifies the party or parties against whom each specific legal claim is asserted; and 3. Lists under each specific legal claim only those facts which are necessary to that claim. Plaintiffs complaint SHALL BE LIMITED to the current named Defendants: A. Megan J. Brennan, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service; and B. American Postal Worker Union AFL-CIO. If Plaintiff fails to comply with the Court's instructions regarding her new amended complaint, it will dismiss her suit without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/7/2019. (CLO)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 3 ] is GRANTED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a), the filing fee is waived. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for lea ve to file amended complaint [ECF No. 5 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to supplement the record in response to the Court's show cause order [ECF No. 8 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plain tiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 2 ] is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process toissue upon the amended complaint as to defendant Megan J. Brennan, Postmaster General UnitedStates Postal Service, with regard to plaintiff's allegations of age discrimination, disabilitydiscrimination, and retaliation.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process toissue upon the amended complaint as to defendant American Postal Worker Union AFL-CIO,with regard to plaintiff's allegations of breach of duty. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/9/19. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayton v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind A. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Postal Worker Union AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?