Mann v. Missouri Home Therapy, LLC
Plaintiff: Latonia Mann
Defendant: Missouri Home Therapy, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv01046
Filed: June 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Noelle C. Collins
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs counsel shall pay defense counsel $587.50 in attorneys fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 11/8/2019. (TMT)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Missouri In Home Services, LLC's "Motion for Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear at Deposition" (Doc. 42 ) is GRANTED, in part and DENIED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs counsel shall pay defense counsel $150.00 for the court reporter's non-appearance fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants request for attorney's fees and costs is granted as to the time defense counsel spen t waiting for Plaintiff and her counsel to appear for Plaintiff's deposition as well as for a portion of his time spent on briefing the current motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defense counsel shall provide the Court with his applicable bil ling records and an associated affidavit supporting his requests for attorney's fees within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. The Court will issue another Order addressing the exact amount of attorney's fees Plaintiff's cou nsel shall provide to defense counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall provide Plaintiff with a copy of this Order and file a certification of his compliance with this Order on or before October 21, 2019. The certificatio n shall also indicate whether Plaintiff intends to proceed with this matter. An Amended Case Management Order will be issued upon receipt of counsel's certification. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff chooses to move forward with this a ction, Plaintiff shall make herself available and appear for her deposition on or before October 25, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action, with prejudice. (Response to Court due by 10/24/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/17/2019. (TMT)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties' Consent Motion to Amend Case Management Order (Doc. 41 ) is GRANTED, in part and DENIED, in part. The discovery deadline and the dispositive motions deadlines are stayed pending re solution of Defendant's Motion. The Court will issue an amended case management order at that time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant Missouri In Home Services, LLC's "Motion for Sanctions for Plaintiff& #039;s Failure to Appear at Deposition" (Doc. 42 ) on or before October 8, 2019. In his response, Plaintiffs counsel shall indicate whether he has been able to discuss the serious nature of Defendant's Motion with Plaintiff. The Court may set the Motion for hearing at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on October 4, 2019. (BRP)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Latonia Mann's Motion to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d) (Doc. 25 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Missouri Home Therapy, LLC and Missouri In Home Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 23 ) is GRANTED, in part and DENIED, in part. Plaintiff Latonia Mann shall file an amended complaint in accordance with this Order within fourteen (14) days. Nothing in this Order alters the Case Management Order previously entered in this case. All other deadlines set forth in that Case Management Order remain in full force and effect. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 6/18/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 6/4/2019. (AFC)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Missouri Home Therapy, LLC's (MissouriHome Therapy) Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5 ) is DENIED, as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Missouri Home Therapy, LLC, shall haveuntil October 16, 2018, to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 10/9/2018. (AFC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Missouri Home Therapy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Home Therapy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonia Mann
Represented By: Matthew J. Ghio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?