MNG 2005, Inc. v. Paymentech, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MNG 2005, Inc.
Defendant: Paymentech, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Visa USA, Inc. and Mastercard International, Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2018cv01155
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by MNG 2005, Inc.. Mastercard International, Incorporated served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Cohen, Nathan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by MNG 2005, Inc.. Visa USA, Inc. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Cohen, Nathan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 36 (Deleted - to be refiled by attorney using the correct event) NOTICE Service: by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc. on Mastercard International, Incorporated (Cohen, Nathan) Modified on 9/5/2018 (KKS).
September 4, 2018 Filing 35 (Deleted - to be refiled by attorney using the correct event) NOTICE Service: by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc. on Defendant Visa USA, Inc. (Cohen, Nathan) Modified on 9/5/2018 (KKS).
August 31, 2018 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to defendant Mastercard International, Incorporated, Visa USA, Inc. The summons were emailed to plaintiff's attorney Nathan Cohen. (JAB)
August 30, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE Process Server: by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc. (Cohen, Nathan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 32 REQUEST for Issuance Summonses by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan) Modified on 8/30/2018;changed event from Motion to Request (JAB).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #30 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant and Amend Complaint by Interlineation by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc... Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/29/18. (KKS)
August 28, 2018 Filing 30 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant and Amend Complaint by Interlineation by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. waiver signed on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Mangian, David)
August 23, 2018 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by David M. Mangian for Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.. (Mangian, David)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Doc. #23 ), is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Paymentech, LLC's oral motion for an extension of time to file an answer or responsive pleading is GRANTED. Paymentech, LLC shall file its responsive pleading no later than Monday, September 17, 2018. ( Response to Court due by 9/17/2018.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/15/18. (KKS)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically (Doc. #25 ), is GRANTED. Mr. Cohen is directed to call the conference line toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference is: 7519116.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/13/18. (KKS)
August 13, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Hearing Status Conference to be Conducted by Teleconference by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Addition of Parties against defendant MNG 2005, Inc. Amendment to #6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Addition of Parties, filed by MNG 2005, Inc.. Related document: #6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by MNG 2005, Inc..(Cohen, Nathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Add Party and for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Paymentech, LLC's Motion to Vacate the Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #16 ), is GRANTED. With the consent of Plaintiff (Doc. 18), the Temporary Restraining Order entered in the St. Louis County Circuit Court on July 10, 2018, and extended on July 2, 2018, (Doc. 4-1 at 26-29), is DISSOLVED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. #19 ), is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 10:30 a.m. on August 15, 2018, is VACATED and the parties are directed to appear in the chambers of the undersigned for a status conference at that time and date. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/6/2018. (CLO)
August 3, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Leave to Amend Pleadings and Join Additional Parties filed by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan)
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Leave to Amend Pleadings and Join Additional Parties filed by Defendant Paymentech, LLC. (Mangian, David)
July 31, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Amend Pleadings and Join Additional Parties by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan)
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 CONSENT to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order Judgment by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc... (Cohen, Nathan)
July 20, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Vacate #7 Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Paymentech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Christopher Cox, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit Emma Coronado-Harvey, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Mangian, David)
July 20, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Vacate #7 Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Paymentech, LLC. (Mangian, David)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Following a telephone conference with counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's oral motion for a 30-day extension of time to file an answer or responsive pleading is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/17/2018. (CLO)
July 17, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Paymentech, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hohn, Christopher)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The deadline to deposit funds as required by the TRO entered in state court shall be extended until the Court can rule on Defendant's contemplated Motion to Dissolve. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall apply: Defendant shall file its Motion to Dissolve the TRO no later than Friday, July 20, 2018 at 12:00 noon; Plaintiff shall file its response no later than Wednesday, August 1, 2018; Defendant shall file its reply, if any, no more than ten days after Plaintiffs response is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on the contemplated Motion to Dissolve is set for Wednesday, August 15, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/16/2018. (CLO)
July 16, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Emergency MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Pay Funds Into Registry of Court in TRO filed by Plaintiff MNG 2005, Inc.. (Cohen, Nathan)
July 16, 2018 Filing 11 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings (KXS)
July 16, 2018 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Pay Funds Into Registry of Court in TRO by Defendant Paymentech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mangian, David)
July 13, 2018 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
July 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Docket Sheet. (BAK)
July 13, 2018 Filing 7 (DISSOLVED per Order #22 ) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (BAK) Modified on 8/6/2018 (CLO).
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by MNG 2005, Inc..(BAK)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Paymentech, LLC.. (Hohn, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Paymentech, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Hohn, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by David M. Mangian for Defendant Paymentech, LLC. (Mangian, David)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher M. Hohn for Defendant Paymentech, LLC. (Hohn, Christopher)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 18SL-CC02552, with receipt number 0865-6640934, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Paymentech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Hohn, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MNG 2005, Inc. v. Paymentech, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MNG 2005, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paymentech, LLC
Represented By: David M. Mangian
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David M. Mangian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard International, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?